Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION REFORM et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00438
Date Filed2016-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning communications to the agency from the White House pertaining to resettlement of Syrian refugees. The Federation also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for the same kinds of records. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, the Federation filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-041COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4437135) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Summons Summons for Dept. of State, # 3 Summons Summons for AG, # 4 Summons Summons for DC Attorney, # 5 Summons Summons for USCIS, # 6 Certificate of Service Certificate Rule LC R 7.1)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-03-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (md) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (md) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-073SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/14/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-03-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/14/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-03-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/14/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/13/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-03-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/14/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-04-138ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(LaCour, Alice) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-149STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/14/2016. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-1810NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Justin Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, Stuart) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-05-2311MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Robinson, Stuart) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-06-3012MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Robinson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff