Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00441
Date Filed2016-03-07
Date Closed2016-09-16
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State for emails sent or received by several members of former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton's staff to representatives at the Clinton Foundation. Citizens United requested expedited processing for each request, which the agency granted. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4437525) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons Summons to Dept of State, # 4 Summons Summons to US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/8/2016) (jf). (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-04-144NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Anne Crowley on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-145ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-146ORDER. By April 28, 2016, defendant shall inform the Court of the extent to which the FOIA requests at issue in this case are duplicative of other pending requests and the status of those requests. By May 12, 2016, defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/14/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: By 4/28/2016, defendant shall inform the Court of the extent to which the FOIA request at issue in this case is duplicative of other pending requests and the status of those requests; By 5/12/2016, Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff. (jth) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-287NOTICE Regarding Duplicative Requests by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-128STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-129NOTICE Regarding Duplicative Requests by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Crowley, Megan) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-1310STATUS REPORT Response to Defendant's Production Proposal by CITIZENS UNITED. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 8 defendant's status report and 10 plaintiff's response, it is ORDERED that defendant shall produce all responsive, non-exempt documents to plaintiff on a rolling basis, with productions on June 24, 2016, August 1, 2016, and September 7, 2016, and it shall provide plaintiff with a draft Vaughn Index, if necessary, by September 12, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by September 16, 2016, plaintiff shall file a status report advising the Court whether it plans to challenge any of defendant's withholdings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/16/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall produce all responsive, non-exempt documents to plaintiff on a rolling basis, with productions on 6/24/2016, 8/1/2016, and 9/7/2016; and it shall provide plaintiff with a draft Vaughn Index, if necessary, by 9/12/2016. Plaintiff shall file a status report advising the Court whether it plans to challenge any of defendant's withholdings by 9/16/2016. (jth) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-09-0211NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Layton on behalf of All Defendants (Layton, Elisabeth) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-1612STIPULATION of Dismissal by CITIZENS UNITED. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff