Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00447
Date Filed2016-03-07
Date Closed2016-08-31
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
PlaintiffFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environment Legal Institute submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Energy for correspondence between certain named DOE employees and outside parties. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after failing to provide any substantive response to either request, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4438406) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE, FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons to Agency, # 2 Summons Summons to US Attorney, # 3 Summons Summons to US Attorney General, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-03-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(jd) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-283NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-04-144Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-19ORDER granting 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/19/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-05-165ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/16/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 5/31/2016. (kt) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-256Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of 6 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant complete its production of responsive records by June 24, 2016. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs communicate to Defendant their objections to any withholdings by July 8, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties file an additional joint status report by July 22, 2016 and propose a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/26/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-267NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Mandelbaum on behalf of ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE, FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/27/2016) (ztd). (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to complete its production of responsive records by 6/24/2016; Plaintiffs to communicate to Defendant their objections to any withholdings by 7/8/2016; Parties to file an additional joint status report by 7/22/2016. (kt) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-07-228Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court hereby enters the following summary-judgment briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by August 22, 2016; Plaintiff's opposition due by September 19, 2016; Defendant's reply due by October 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/26/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 8/22/2016; Plaintiff's opposition due by 9/19/2016; Defendant's reply due by 10/3/2016. (kt) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-199Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 9 consent motion for extension of time. It is hereby ORDERED that the summary-judgment briefing schedule be amended as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by September 6, 2016; Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion shall be due by October 4, 2016; Defendant's reply in support of its motion shall be due by October 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/22/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by September 6, 2016; Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion shall be due by October 4, 2016; Defendant's reply in support of its motion shall be due by October 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/22/2016. (zlsj) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-3010NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement agreement)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff