Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00475
Date Filed2016-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Adnan Gulshair el Shukrijumah, a Saudi Arabian citizen who had been killed in 2014 by Pakistani military forces. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4442443) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. DOJ)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-10Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (jd) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
2016-03-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
2016-03-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/16/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/15/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/16/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/16/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-04-145ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 5/6/16. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/15/16. (DJS) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/6/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-05-066STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-10MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 6 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report and proposed order not later than July 15, 2016. In that status report, the parties shall either propose a briefing schedule or provide the Court with more complete information concerning efforts at narrowing issues and determining the amount of documents at issue in this matter. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall provide a further production prior to July 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/10/16. (DJS) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/15/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-07-157Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 7 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report and PROPOSED ORDER not later than August 22, 2016. In that status report, the parties shall either propose a briefing schedule or provide the Court with additional information concerning efforts at narrowing issues and determining the amount of documents at issue in this matter. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/18/16. (DJS) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Order due no later than 8/22/2016 (tth) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-08-228Third STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-23MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 8 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall have until September 30, 2016, to file a further Joint Status Report, along with a proposed order, that includes a proposed briefing schedule or that provides the Court with more complete information concerning efforts at narrowing issues and determining the amount of documents at issue in this matter. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/23/16. (DJS) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/30/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-09-309Joint STATUS REPORT Fourth Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report filed by the parties 9 it is hereby ordered that the parties shall have until November 3, 2016, to file a further Joint Status Report to either propose a briefing schedule or provide the Court with more complete information concerning efforts at narrowing issues and determining the amount of documents at issue in this matter. The Status Report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/3/16. (DJS) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/3/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-11-0310Joint MOTION to Bifurcate by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-04MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Consent Motion to Bifurcate. The Parties shall have to, and including, March 6, 2017, to file a further Joint Status Report, along with a proposed order. Defendant FBI may file a Vaughn Index or declaration based on the applicability of 5 U.S.C. § 552(b)(7)(A) to certain records without waiving any allegation that those records are exempt from release for other reasons. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/4/16. (DJS) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 3/6/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2017-03-0112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-04MINUTE ORDER: Granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status. Joint Status and proposed order due March 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/4/17. (DJS) (Entered: 03/04/2017)
2017-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and proposed order due by 3/23/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-2313Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 13 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by April 13, 2017, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-1314Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 14 , it is hereby ordered that the parties have until May 17, 2017, to file a further Joint Status Report to either propose a briefing schedule or provide the Court with more complete information concerning efforts at narrowing issues and determining the amount of documents at issue in this matter. A proposed order shall accompany the status report. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/17/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-1715Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-18MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status report 15 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by June 13, 2017 and every 45 days thereafter until such time as they jointly propose a briefing schedule. Any proposed briefing schedule shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/18/17. (DJS) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2017. (tb) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-1316Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-07-3117Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-09-1118Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-11-01Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-0319STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on November 15, 2017. (lctnm2) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff