Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union v. Administration for Children and Families
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2016cv01987
Date Filed2016-03-17
Date Closed2016-10-28
JudgeJudge Jed S. Rakoff
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Administration for Children and Families for materials related to the U.S. Conference for Catholic Bishops' application and final award of funding for services for victims of human trafficking. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAdministration for Children and Families
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-171COMPLAINT against Administration for Children and Families. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12077161)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-172CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-173RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-174REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Administration for Children and Families, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-185ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Administration for Children and Families. (rch) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (rch) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (rch) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18Case Designated ECF. (rch) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-186NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 4-4-2016, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/4/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/18/2016) (ama) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-237AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Administration for Children and Families served on 3/22/2016, answer due 5/23/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-03-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2016. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-298AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Administration for Children and Families.Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/29/2016. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-309NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Tulis on behalf of Administration for Children and Families. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-04-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/4/2016. The next appearance before this Courtis calendared for April 8, 2016 at 11:00a.m. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/6/2016. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 4/8/2016. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-2510ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families.(Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-04-2511AMENDED ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-05-1712ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from ELIZABETH TULIS dated 5/16/2016 re: I write respectfully on behalf of both parties pursuant to the Court's order issued at the conference held on April 8, 2016, to provide a status update to the Court regarding productions of documents in this FOIA case and to propose further deadlines. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED, but no further extensions. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/16/2016) (ama) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-07-2013ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Elizabeth Tulis dated 7/18/2016 re: status report to the Court regarding this FOIA case, and to propose further deadlines. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/18/2016) (cf) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-08-3114ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Elizabeth Tulis dated 8/29/2016 re: Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that the Court allow them to submit another status update in two weeks, on September 12, 2016, which will (1) confirm that no summary judgment motion practice will be necessary, or propose a schedule for such motions, and (2) if no summary judgment motions are necessary, propose a schedule for resolving any issues regarding attorney's fees. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/30/2016) (kl) Modified on 8/31/2016 (kl). (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 9/13/2016. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-10-2815STIPULATION AND ORDER: 1. ACF shall pay to the ACLU the sum of fourteen thousand dollars ($14,000) for attorneys' fees and litigation costs (the "Settlement Amount") as further set forth in this order. 2. The ACLU releases and discharges ACF, the United States of America, and the United States of America's agencies, departments, officers, employees, servants, and agents from any and all claims and causes of action that the ACLU asserted, or could have asserted, in this litigation arising out of the ACLU's November 2015 FOIA request. In consideration for, and effective upon, payment of the Settlement Amount, this release and discharge includes any and all claims for attorneys' fees and litigation costs that the ACLU asserted, or could have asserted, in this litigation. 3. Pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees other than as provided in paragraph 1 of this Stipulation and Order, provided that the Court shall retain jurisdiction over any issues that might arise relating the enforcement of this Stipulation and Order as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/27/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff