Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. U.S. STATE DEPARTMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00516
Date Filed2016-03-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffFREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFreedom Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning Huma Abedin, an aide to former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton. Freedom Watch also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Freedom Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-181COMPLAINT pursuant to FOIA 5 USC 552 against STATE DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4451017) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 State Department designation of fax number for filing FOIA requests, # 2 Exhibit 2 FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit 3 Fax confirmation of FOIA request transmitted to Defendant on February 24, 2016, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Declaration Related Case Notice, # 6 Summons US State Department, # 7 Summons US Attorney General, # 8 Summons US Attorney for District of Columbia)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-182NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 13-cv-1363. (md) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-04-184MOTION for Discovery Consolidated with Discovery in Related Case by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judge Lamberth's Order, # 2 Exhibit Judge Sullivan's Order, # 3 Exhibit Response of Department of State, # 4 Exhibit response of Judicial Watch, # 5 Exhibit Supplemental Response of Judicial Watch, # 6 Exhibit Judicial Watch's Proposed Discovery Plan)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-185NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 13-cv-1363 (EGS). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judge Lamberth's Order, # 2 Exhibit Judge Sullivan's Order, # 3 Exhibit Response of Department of State, # 4 Exhibit response of Judicial Watch, # 5 Exhibit Supplemental Response of Judicial Watch, # 6 Exhibit Judicial Watch's Proposed Discovery Plan)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-256Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Discovery Consolidated with Discovery in Related Case and Motion to Stay filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-04-257ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-04-258MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (See Docket entry 6 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-26MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any reply to Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition no later than 5:00 p.m. Wednesday, April 27, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 26, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-26MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's motion to stay no later than 12:00 p.m. Friday, April 29, 2016. Defendant shall file any reply no later than 5:00 p.m. Monday, May 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 26, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Reply To Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition due on 4/27/2016 by 5:00pm. (mac) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To Defendant's Motion To Stay due on 4/29/2016 by 12:00pm. Defendant Reply due on 5/2/2016 by 5:00pm. (mac) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-279NOTICE of Related Case by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. re Order (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-2810RESPONSE to Judicial Watch's Memorandum in Opposition to Discovery Consolidation in 13-cv-01363 filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Jury Verdict and Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Notice of Related Cases)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-04-2911RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Stay filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-0212REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Stay filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-04MINUTE ORDER denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate discovery and, for substantially the same reasons articulated by Defendant, granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 4, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-07-1113MOTION for Discovery to Participate in Discovery by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1214ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Intervene for Freedom Watch to Participate in Discovery by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) Modified on 7/12/2016 (jf). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2016-07-12NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 14 MOTION to Intervene for Freedom Watch to Participate in Discovery was entered in error. (jf) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2016-07-2815RESPONSE re 13 MOTION for Discovery to Participate in Discovery filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-08-29MINUTE ORDER. In view of the Court's Minute Order of May 4, 2016 STAYING this case pending the completion of discovery in Judicial Watch v. Dep't of State, Civil Action No. 13-1363, 13 motion to participate in discovery is DENIED given that discovery in Civil Action No. 13-1363 is not complete. See Marsh v. Johnson, 263 F. Supp 2d. 49, 52 (D.D.C. 2003). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/29/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-11-0116Emergency MOTION to Intervene in case 13cv1363 by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) Modified on 11/2/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-0117Supplemental MOTION to Intervene in case 13cv1363 (Addendum) by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Klayman, Larry) Modified on 11/2/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-02MINUTE ORDER denying 16 emergency motion to intervene in Civil Action No. 13-1363 and 17 supplemental motion. On August 29, 2016, the Court STAYED this case pending the completion of discovery in Judicial Watch v. Dep't of State, Civil Action No. 13-1363. Discovery in that case is ongoing and thus there is no reason the lift the stay. See Marsh v. Johnson, 263 F. Supp 2d. 49, 52 (D.D.C. 2003). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff