Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00534
Date Filed2016-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for copies of concluding documents contained in any Inspector General investigations closed during 2013-2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Leopold had some back and forth communications about the status of the request, but after hearing nothing substantive from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-211COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4453288) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons Summons ODNI, # 4 Summons Summons USAO)(Pezzoli, Timothy) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (jd) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-223ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 22, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2016. (Pezzoli, Timothy) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/22/2016. (Pezzoli, Timothy) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-04-156NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-157Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-158ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE answer due 5/5/2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/15/16. (dot) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-05-059NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-0510ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-0511ORDER directing the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter by no later than JUNE 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 5, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2016. (dot) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-06-0612Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-07MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a JOINT STATUS REPORT within two weeks of the date that Defendant completes its production of all responsive, non-exempt records. The Joint Status Report shall indicate whether the parties have resolved all disputes or whether the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions, in which case the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 7, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-2913NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Creed Kelly on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-07-0714NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JASON LEOPOLD. Attorney Timothy J. Pezzoli terminated. (Pezzoli, Timothy) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-08-12MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On June 6, 2016, the parties filed a 12 Joint Status Report indicating that Defendant had completed its search for responsive records and noting that "Defendant will make a rolling production of non-exempt records that are responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, with the first interim production occurring on or before July 19, 2016." On June 7, 2016, at the parties' request, the Court entered a Minute Order directing the parties to file a Joint Status Report within two weeks of the date that Defendant completes its production of all responsive, non-exempt records. At this time, no Joint Status Report has been filed. As such, the parties are hereby directed to file a Joint Status Report by no later than AUGUST 22, 2016, advising the Court as to the status of Defendant's production of responsive, non-exempt records. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 12, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties are to file a Joint Status Report by no later than 8/22/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-2215Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-29MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On August 22, 2016, the parties filed a 15 Joint Status Report indicating that Defendant had completed its search for responsive records and as of August 19, 2016, produced all but two responsive records that it located. Defendant further indicated that it shall make its best efforts to produce the remaining responsive records to Plaintiff on or before September 30, 2016, as it must consult with outside agencies prior to production. At the parties' request, the parties are hereby directed to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT within two weeks of the date that Defendant completes its production of all responsive, non-exempt records, but by no later than OCTOBER 7, 2016. The Joint Status Report shall indicate whether the parties have resolved all disputes or whether the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions, in which case the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 29, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2016. (dot) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-10-0716Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-07MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On October 7, 2016, the parties filed a 16 Joint Status Report indicating that Defendant produced all but one responsive record that was located in its search. Defendant further indicated that it shall make its best efforts to produce the remaining responsive records to Plaintiff on or before November 7, 2016, as it must consult with outside agencies prior to production. At the parties' request, the parties are hereby directed to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT within two weeks of the date that Defendant completes its production of all responsive, non-exempt records, but by no later than NOVEMBER 21, 2016. The Joint Status Report shall indicate whether the parties have resolved all disputes or whether the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions, in which case the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 7, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2016. (dot) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-11-2117Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-21MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On November 21, 2016, the parties filed a 17 Joint Status Report indicating that review of the remaining responsive record is ongoing and currently with an outside agency. Defendant further indicated that it shall make its best efforts to produce the remaining responsive record to Plaintiff on or before December 21, 2016. At the parties' request, the parties are hereby directed to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT within two weeks of the date that Defendant completes its production of all responsive, non-exempt records, but by no later than JANUARY 4, 2017. The Joint Status Report shall indicate whether the parties have resolved all disputes or whether the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions, in which case the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 21, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2017. (dot) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2017-01-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-04MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On January 4, 2017, the parties filed a 18 Joint Status Report indicating that Defendant completed its response to Plaintiff's FOIA request on December 29, 2016, and that Plaintiff currently is reviewing the final production. At the parties' request, the parties are hereby directed to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by no later than JANUARY 12, 2017, indicating whether the parties have resolved all disputes or whether the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions, in which case the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 4, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-1219STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-12MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 12, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff