Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00574
Date Filed2016-03-28
Date Closed2017-03-15
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's processing of a December 2012 FOIA request submitted by CREW. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4462365) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of State)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-28Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-284STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/28/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-04-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/4/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/4/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-05-046MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-04MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time 6 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before May 18, 2016. The parties shall appear for a status conference in this matter on May 26, 2016, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/4/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before 5/18/2016. A Status Conference is set for 5/26/2016, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-047NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-048ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 5/26/2016. Defendant to begin production of documents by 7/29/2016; Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2016. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-08-059Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 9 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a further Joint Status Report informing the Court of the State Department's progress and suggesting a schedule for further proceedings on or before September 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/12/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-09-0610Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint status report 10 , the Court approves the proposed schedule. The State Department shall make an additional production on or before September 29, 2016, and the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/16/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: The State Department shall make an additional production on or before 9/29/2016; The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 10/5/2016. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-10-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint status report 11 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a further joint status report on or before November 18, 2016, suggesting a schedule for further proceedings as necessary. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/6/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2016. (kt) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-11-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-12-0113NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Attorney John Cuong Truong terminated. (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint status report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following deadlines shall govern briefing in this case: (1) defendant may file a motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index on or before January 27, 2017; (2) plaintiff may file a combined opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before February 24, 2017; (3) defendant may file a combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 24, 2017; and (4) plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file a motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index on or before 1/27/2017; Plaintiff may file a combined opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 2/24/2017; Defendant may file a combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/24/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 4/7/2017. (kt) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2017-01-2414Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time 14 , the motion is GRANTED, and is hereby ORDERED that defendant may file its motion for summary judgment on or before February 10, 2017; that plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before March 10, 2017; that defendant may file a combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 7, 2017; and that plaintiff may file a reply in support its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/27/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may file its motion for summary judgment on or before 2/10/2017; Plaintiff may file a combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before 3/10/2017; Defendant may file a combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 4/7/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply in support its cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 4/21/2017. (kt) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-1015MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1016Vaughn Index from Eric F. Stein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vaughn Index, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-03-1017NOTICE Concerning Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's representation that "[t]he only remaining issue" in this case "concerns an award of attorneys' fees and other litigation costs," 17 , the case is hereby DISMISSED as moot, and the government's motion for summary judgment 15 is hereby DENIED as moot. The Court will retain jurisdiction to resolve any dispute over attorneys' fees or litigation costs. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff