Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00576
Date Filed2016-03-28
Date Closed2016-05-18
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning any interviews conducted by the agency with Barack Obama, Rahm Emanuel, or Valerie Jarrett pertaining to Rod Blagojevich. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and denied it under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Judicial Watch appealed to the Office of Information Policy, which upheld the FBI's denial. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4462630) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-28Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-04-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/4/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/4/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-05-045NOTICE of Appearance by Deepthy Kishore on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-046ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-05MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint briefing schedule, setting dates for Defendant's dispositive motion, Plaintiff's opposition, and Defendant's reply. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/5/2016. (KD) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-187STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-05-18MINUTE ORDER approving 7 parties' joint stipulation of dismissal without prejudice. This case is dismissed and closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/18/2016. (KD) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff