Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management et al
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.1 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2016cv00130
Date Filed2016-03-29
Date Closed2016-11-22
JudgeJudge Edward J. Lodge
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionThe Western Watersheds Project submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management. One was for records concerning the Garat allotment, a livestock-grazing allotment in Idaho's Owyhee Canyonlands. The other request was for records regarding the Argenta allotment in northern Nevada. After the agency failed to respond to either request, the Western Watersheds Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1424245.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-03-302Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management and U.S. Department of the Interior. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Dept. of the Interior summons)(st)
2016-03-303LITIGATION ORDER. On or before 6/29/2016, the parties shall file with the court the joint Litigation Plan. (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2016 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge.). Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
2016-03-304Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Ruether, Kristin)
2016-05-045MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Nicholas J Woychick appearing for Defendants Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior. Responses due by 5/31/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(Woychick, Nicholas)
2016-05-266AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1)(B) against All Defendants, filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline Changes from Original)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-05-267RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Western Watersheds Project. Replies due by 6/13/2016.(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-05-278NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior and Western Watersheds Project re 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/29/2016. (st)
2016-06-029Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
2016-06-1310REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E)(Woychick, Nicholas)
2016-06-2811Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 6 Amended Complaint Kristin F. Ruether appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 2nd amended complaint- redline version)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-06-2812AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, filed by Western Watersheds Project.(Ruether, Kristin) Modified on 6/28/2016 to edit text for parties (cjs).
2016-06-2813MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Kristin F. Ruether appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Surreply)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-06-2914SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Bureau of Land Management. (Woychick, Nicholas)
2016-06-2915SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan form)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-07-1116DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The 7/15/2016 telephonic scheduling is VACATED. All dispositive motions, if any, shall be due within 30 days following the Court's ruling on 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Department of the Interior, Bureau of Land Management. Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dmc)
2016-08-01The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (cjs)
2016-08-1517NOTICE by Western Watersheds Project re 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Factual Development (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-11-2218Joint MOTION to Dismiss Kristin F. Ruether appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 12/16/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Settlement)(Ruether, Kristin)
2016-11-2219ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss 18 should be, and is hereby, GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Settlement Agreement is INCORPORATED into this Order. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this action to the extent necessary to ensure the parties' compliance with the Settlement Agreement; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above- captioned action, should be, and is hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff