Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00591
Date Filed2016-03-30
Date Closed2016-12-07
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") FAIR
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel for records concerning the names of employees or contractors who worked on the legal rationale for prioritizing the removal of certain kinds of aliens. OLC provided a partial response to one part of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4465676) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Department of Justice, # 3 Summons for US Attorney, # 4 Summons for Attorney General)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-30Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sth) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-313LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/4/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/4/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-05-047ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kirschner, Adam) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-208GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 20, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-20MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before June 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 20, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule due by 6/10/2016. (hs) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-06-109Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations set forth in the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule 9 filed on June 10, 2016, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court by August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 14, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/12/2016 (tj) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-08-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-10-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT on or before October 28, 2016, that includes a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/05/16. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2016 (hs) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-2811Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kirschner, Adam) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report filed on October 28, 2016, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file an additional joint status report on or before December 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/31/16. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/2/2016. (hs) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-12-0212STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kirschner, Adam) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 7, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff