Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGELLMAN v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00635
Date Filed2016-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffBARTON GELLMAN
Case DescriptionJournalist Barton Gellman submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, and other agencies for records pertaining to him as part of his research for a book on government collection of data about journalists. For each request, he asked for expedited processing. None of the agencies had responded to his request by the time he filed suit. For several requests he appealed the agency's failure to respond and also appealed to the Office of Government Information Services. After none of the agencies had yet responded, Gellman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4471461) filed by BARTON GELLMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 12 Summons to Department of Homeland Security, # 13 Summons to Department of Justice, # 14 Summons to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, # 15 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-04Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-052SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/11/2016. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/11/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/11/2016. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/8/2016 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/11/2016 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 4/11/2016 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-228NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-05-099Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (to June 10, 2016) by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-1010NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-11MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including June 10, 2016 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/11/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall have up to and including 6/10/2016 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (kt) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-06-0911Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-0912ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/9/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-2113NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of BARTON GELLMAN (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-09-2114Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-11-2115Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2017-01-2316Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-03-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff