Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSave Our Recreation et al v. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2016cv01724
Date Filed2016-04-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJames Donato
PlaintiffSave Our Recreation
PlaintiffSasn Francisco Dog Owners Group
PlaintiffMarin County Dog Owners Group
PlaintiffCoastside Dog Owners Group
Case DescriptionSave Our Recreation and the San Francisco Dog Owners Group submitted a FOIA request to the National Park Service for records concerning a proposed rule the groups believed would restrict access for dog owners in Golden Gate National Recreation Area. After a number of inquiries about the status of their request, the agency provided a partial response. However, after hearing nothing more substantive from the agency, Save Our Recreation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
DefendantDepartment of the Interior
DefendantNational Park Service
DefendantSally Jewell
DefendantChristine Lehnertz
DefendantHoward Levitt
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [28]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-051COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10347993.). Filed byMarin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Coastside Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/5/2016) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-052Proposed Summons. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/5/2016) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-053Certificate of Interested Entities by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/5/2016) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-054Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 4/19/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-065Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-066Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Christine Lehnertz, Howard Levitt, National Park Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-067CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation.. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-068CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-069ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/6/16. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-0710CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2016.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/6/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-0811CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation April 6, 2016 Certificate of Service (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/8/2016) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-0812CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation April 8, 2016 Certificate of Service (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/8/2016) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-1213NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lo (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/12/2016) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-2914STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/29/2016) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-0615Order by Hon. James Donato granting 14 Stipulated Request to Shorten Time re Case Management Conference. The July 13, 2016 case management conference is re-set for May 18, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-0616ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Christine Lehnertz, Howard Levitt, National Park Service. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 5/6/2016) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-06Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-1117CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 5/11/2016) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-1918Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/18/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2016) Modified on 1/18/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-1919CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement. ***Set/Clear Flags (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-2420AFFIDAVIT CERTIFICATION RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-2421AFFIDAVIT CERTIFICATION RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-2422AFFIDAVIT re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial Certification re Civil Minute Order dated May 18, 2016 by Department of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Christine Lehnertz, Howard Levitt, National Park Service. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-2423Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 5/24/2016. Further Telephone Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2016 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Parties shall use the same conference call dial-in number. Settlement Conference set for 6/7/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Navtej Dhillon; Christopher Carr. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-2724Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 5/27/2016. Further Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Settlement Conference set for 6/7/2016 is continued to 7/19/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. Client Reps for Defendant: Mike Savage; Kristen Wheeler. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-1525Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 6/15/2016. Further Telephone Conference set for 6/17/2016 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Not reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2016) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-1726Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 6/17/2016. Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2016) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-07-1927Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 7/19/2016. Further Telephone Conference set for 7/25/2016 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2528ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 25, 2016. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2529Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2016. Court to issue further settlement conference order. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2016) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-26Set/Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 8/23/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-23Set/Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 10/14/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-2330Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 8/23/2016. Court to issue settlement conference order no. 2. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2016) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-2331ORDER NO. 2 FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/23/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016) (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-09-1632Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 9/16/2016. Further settlement conference set for 10/14/2016 at 9:30 a.m. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2016) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-10-1233NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Guy Welti (Welti, Tyler) (Filed on 10/12/2016) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-1434Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 10/14/2016. Court to issue Settlement Conference Order. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navi Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2016) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1435Please disregard. Filed in error. ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephone Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016) Modified on 10/14/2016 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1436***Please disregard, filed in error.*** ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephone settlement conference set for 11/17/2016 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016) Modified on 10/31/2016 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1437ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-1638CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Telephone Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the telephone conference currently scheduled for November 17, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley is vacated. The Court will schedule an in-person settlement conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-23Set/Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-12-1439Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 12/14/2016. The settlement conference scheduled for 12/19/2016 remains on calendar. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2016) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-1940Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 12/19/2016. Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2016) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2741ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Lift Settlement Stay filed by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. Responses due by 1/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Navi Singh Dhillon in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Lift Stay, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Lift Stay)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2016) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2016-12-3042OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Lift Settlement Stay ) filed byDepartment of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Christine Lehnertz, Howard Levitt, National Park Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 12/30/2016) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-1143ORDER. The Court sets a status conference for 1/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/11/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-1344TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 18, 2016 before Hon. James Donato by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Welti, Tyler) (Filed on 1/13/2017) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-1345TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 18, 2016 before Hon. James Donato by Department of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Christine Lehnertz, Howard Levitt, National Park Service, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 1/13/2017) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-1946JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2017) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-2447Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 1/24/2017. Further Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2017) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-2648Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Status Conference held on 1/26/2017.Total Time in Court 22 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2017) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-02-0249TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/26/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Welti, Tyler) (Filed on 2/2/2017) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-0250TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/26/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Department of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Christine Lehnertz, Howard Levitt, National Park Service, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 2/2/2017) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-0351Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 2/3/2017. The next settlement conference is set for March 13, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorney: Tyler Welti. Defendant Attorney: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2017) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-0852Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/26/17, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 50 Transcript Order, 49 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2017. (Related documents(s) 50 , 49 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 2/8/2017) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-1053Transcript of Proceedings held on May 18, 2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 44 Transcript Order, 45 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2017. (Related documents(s) 44 , 45 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-03-1354Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 3/13/2017. (Not Reported) Attorneys for Plaintiff: Christopher Carr; Tyler Welti. Attorney for Defendant: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2017) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-1455Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference with Plaintiff held on 3/14/2017. (Not Reported) Attorney for Plaintiff: Christopher Carr. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2017) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-1556Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference with defendant held on 3/15/2017. (Not Reported) Attorney for Defendant: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/15/2017) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-2057Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference with Plaintiffs held on 3/20/2017. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2017) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2758Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Settlement Conference held with defense counsel on 3/27/2017. (Not Reported) Attorney for Defendants: Michelle Lo. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2017) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-04-1059Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: In-person Settlement Conference with defense counsel held on 4/10/2017. (Not reported) Attorney for Defendant: Michelle Lo. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2017) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1360Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference with Plaintiffs held on 4/13/2017. (Not Reported) This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2017) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-05-0561Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 5/5/2017. Defendant to provide Plaintiff with revised proposal by early next week; Plaintiff to provide proposal as to review of fees by around the same time. Further Telephone Conference set for 5/15/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Not Reported) (Time: 50 minutes) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Christopher Carr; Tyler Welti. Attorney for Defendants: Michelle Lo. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2017) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-1562Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 5/15/2017. Further Telephone Conference set for 6/8/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Not Reported) Attorney for Plaintiffs: Christopher Carr; Tyler Welti. Attorney for Defendants: Michelle Lo. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2017) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-06-0863Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 6/8/2017. Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's joint settlement agreement by June 19, 2017. Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's suggestions, if any, by June 28. The Court will hold a further call with the parties on July 7 at 9 a.m. Also, the Court's CRD will contact the parties regarding scheduling a further in person settlement conference to resolve the fees issue. (Not Reported) (Time: 15 minutes) Further Telephone Conference set for 7/7/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The parties shall use the Court's conference call dial-in number. Attorney for Plaintiffs: Christopher Carr. Attorney for Defendants: Michelle Lo. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2017) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-0964CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a settlement conference is scheduled for July 26, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-07-2465NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher J. Carr (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-25Set/Reset Hearing: By the request of the parties, settlement conference reset for 8/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-08-0866Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 8/8/2017. Telephone Conference set for 8/11/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Further in person settlement conference set for 8/29/2017 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) (Time: 5 hours) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Attorney for Defendant: Michelle Lo. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2017) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1167Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 8/11/2017. Case did not settle. No further court facilitated discussions are contemplated. The in person settlement conference set for 8/29/2017 at 08:00 AM is vacated.(Not reported.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Christopher Carr; Navtej Dhillon. Attorney for Defendants: Michelle Lo. This is a text-only Minute Entry (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2017) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-09-2068NOTICE by Coastside Dog Owners Group, Marin County Dog Owners Group, Sasn Francisco Dog Owners Group, Save Our Recreation Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Welti, Tyler) (Filed on 9/20/2017) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff