Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00655
Date Filed2016-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records pertaining to Muhammad al-Hanooti, an individual who had been born in Palestine but lived in Virginia at the time of his death in June 2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4476239) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-07Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/13/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/13/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-195NOTICE of Appearance by Tammy Allison Holloway on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Holloway, Tammy) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-05-096Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Dispositive Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holloway, Tammy) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before June 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 10, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 6/13/2016. (hs) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-06-147MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Holloway, Tammy) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-148ANSWER to Complaint 1 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Holloway, Tammy) Modified to add linkage on 6/15/2016 (td). (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc to June 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 15, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-159GENERAL ORDER GOVERNING CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 15, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-2810STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before July 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 29, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2016 (hs) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-07-0611NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Tammy A. Holloway (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-2812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-07-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report within 120 days after the defendant makes its first production of documents responsive to the plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act requests that are not subject to exemption. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 29, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2017-01-1013Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
2017-01-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report on or before May 10, 2017, providing the Court with an update on the status of responsive document productions and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 10, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
2017-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2017 (hs) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-05-1014Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff