Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF ANIMALS et al v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00666
Date Filed2016-04-08
Date Closed2016-09-15
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF ANIMALS
PlaintiffRAGS OVER THE ARKANSAS RIVER
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's decision to re-issue a land use permit to the Over the River Corporation to construct an art project covering 5.9 miles of the Arkansas River. The agency withheld several pages under Exemption 3 (other statutes). The agency also withheld 45 pages in full and 243 pages in part under Exemption 5 (privileges). Friends of Animals filed an appeal of the agency's denial, but the agency had not responded by the time Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT An Agency of the United States
DefendantS. M. R. JEWELL in her offical capacity as Secretary of Interior, Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4477938) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BLM, # 3 Summons Jewell, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons Attorney General)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (md) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-112SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-223NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/19/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attny, # 2 Exhibit Return Receipt Attny General, # 3 Exhibit Return Receipt Jewell, # 4 Exhibit Return Receipt BLM)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-04-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 4/21/2016; SALLY JEWELL served on 4/18/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/19/2016. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-196ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, SALLY JEWELL.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-207STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/20/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-06-288PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-019SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendants Summary Judgment Motion is due by 7/29/2016; Plaintiffs Opposition and/or Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 8/22/2016; Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 9/19/2016; Plaintiffs Reply in Support of their Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 10/17/2016. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/29/2016. (jth) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-2910MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, SALLY JEWELL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Diana Fisher (with exhibits), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-1711Amended MOTION for Scheduling Order by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-19MINUTE ORDER granting 11 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the above-captioned case: defendants' Summary Judgment Motion is due by 7/29/2016; plaintiffs' Opposition and/or Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 9/16/2016; defendants' Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 10/14/2016; plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 11/4/2016. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/19/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motions due by 9/16/2016. Response to Cross Motions due by 10/14/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/4/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/16/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/14/2016. (tb) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-1412NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff