Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00667
Date Filed2016-04-08
Date Closed2017-05-26
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cornucopia Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the job performance of Agriculture Marketing Service Deputy Administrator Miles McEvoy. The agency redacted information under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The Cornucopia Institute filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cornucopia Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4478027) filed by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (SUMMONS WERE NOT FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-082REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-05-264ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-26MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/26/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-27ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to complete its production of responsive records by 6/24/2016; Plaintiffs to communicate to Defendant their objections to any withholdings by 7/8/201; Parties to file an additional joint status report by 7/22/2016. (kt) Modified on 5/27/2016 entered in wrong case(kt). (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-05-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties to confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 6/9/2016. (kt) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-06-025NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-086Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Briefing Schedule by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-06-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of 6 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties abide by the following summary-judgment briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by July 29, 2016; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion due by September 2, 2016; Defendant's reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's motion due by September 30, 2016; and Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion due by October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/9/2016. (lccrc2) Modified on 6/9/2016 (kt). (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-097NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE Substituting for attorney Benton Peterson (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 7/29/2016; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion due by 9/2/2016; Defendant's reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's motion due by 9/30/2016; Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion due by 10/14/2016. (kt) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-07-288Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-07-29MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the summary-judgment briefing schedule be amended as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by August 26, 2016; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion due by September 23, 2016; Defendant's reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's motion due by October 21, 2016; and Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion due by November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/29/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-149MOTION for Extension of Time to by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) Modified on 8/15/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 08/14/2016)
2016-08-16MINUTE ORDER granting 9 consent motion for extension of time. It is hereby ORDERED that the summary-judgment briefing schedule be amended as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by October 25, 2016; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion shall be due by November 25, 2016; Defendant's reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's motion shall be due by December 19, 2016; and Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion shall be due by January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/16/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: ORDERED that Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 10/25/2016. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Opposition due by 11/25/2016. Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 12/19/2016. Plaintiff's Replies due by 1/20/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/16/16. (lsj) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-10-2110Consent MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-24MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Consent Motion for Stay of these Proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that the case shall be stayed for 60 days, and the parties shall submit a joint status report by January 4, 2017 updating the Court on any issues remaining to be litigated and, if necessary, proposing a new briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-24Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2017-01-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be stayed until March 31, 2017. It is further ORDERED that, if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed, the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by March 29, 2017 proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/5/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-05Case Stayed, Set/Reset Deadlines:(Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2017) (zlsj) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-03-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 12 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be stayed until April 28, 2017. It is further ORDERED that, if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed, the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by April 28, 2017 with a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-22Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-2713Joint STATUS REPORT by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of 13 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be stayed until June 5, 2017. It is further ORDERED that, if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed, the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by June 5, 2017 with a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2017. Case Stayed (lsj) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-2514STIPULATION of Dismissal by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff