Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00704
Date Filed2016-04-14
Date Closed2016-11-21
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the agency's involvement with operating a detention center in Afghanistan that was referred to in the Senate torture report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It responded to the request by telling the ACLU that it could find no records. The ACLU appealed BOP's decision to OIP, which upheld the agency's decision. The ACLU then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-141COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4484725) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 7.1 Certificate)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(jd) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-143LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (jd) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-254NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-04-275NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Takei on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Takei, Carl) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-05-066NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-09NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Notice (Other); emailed to sobel@att.net, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile using appropriate Summons Returned Executed events on the Service of Process menu. (znmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/20/2016. (Sobel, David) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/10/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/20/16., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/20/2016. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-06-069NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-0710Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-07MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 10, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/7/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-1011ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 24, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/10/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-2312Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, if Defendant locates no responsive records subject to FOIA, the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before August 12, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Defendant does locate responsive records subject to FOIA, the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before September 9, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/23/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-09-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before October 28, 2016; Plaintiff shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion on or before November 30, 2016; Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply in support of its own motion on or before December 16, 2016; and Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its cross-motion on or before January 5, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/3/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-2515Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-25MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that the current briefing schedule is VACATED and this case is STAYED pending further order of the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before November 18, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/25/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/18/2016 (tj) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-2117STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff