Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2016cv02901
Date Filed2016-04-19
Date Closed2016-05-09
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffRon Nixon
Case DescriptionReporter Ron Nixon submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning its annual assessments of fusion centers for the years 2009 to 2014. The agency provided responsive records redacted under Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques), and Exemption 7(F) (harm to a person). The New York Times filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-191COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12203998)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-192FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING -PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) Modified on 4/25/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-193RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ron Nixon, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-194REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Ron Nixon, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-20CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (dgo) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-20Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (dgo) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-20Case Designated ECF. (dgo) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-205ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (dgo) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-256CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-05-067NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security. (Byars, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-098NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) United States Department of Homeland Security. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff