Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNavigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
DistrictNorthern District of Alabama
CitySouthern
Case Number2:2016cv00652
Date Filed2016-04-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Karon O Bowdre
PlaintiffNavigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc
Case DescriptionNavigate Affordable Housing Partners, a project contractor for the Department of Housing and Urban Development, submitted two FOIA requests to HUD for records concerning its reasons for canceling certain contracts and solicitations. After hearing nothing from the agency, Navigate Affordable Housing Partners appealed the agency's failure to respond. Its appeal was granted and the agency was instructed to process the request. After further back and forth with the agency, the organization was told that agency personnel would stop holding such frequent discussions, but provided no indication when the request would be completed. Navigate Affordable Housing Partners then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-221COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, filed by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(SAC ) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-22Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, ALND receipt#: B4601070705/ receipt_number 1126-2609309. related document 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, filed by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(SAC ). (Rutherford, Russell) Modified on 4/25/2016 (SAC, ). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-222Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. filed by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc (Rutherford, Russell) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-223Request for service by certified mail filed by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. (Rutherford, Russell) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-254Summons Issued as to Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; given to Pla. at intake window. (SAC ) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-05-125SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix)(Rutherford, Russell) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-186MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Long, Don) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-05-187ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development's responsive pleading is now due on or before 6/27/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 5/18/16. (MMW) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-06-248ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Long, Don) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-06-299INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/29/2016. (FNC) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-07-1110REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Long, Don) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1311ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for Thursday, July 28, 2016 at 02:30 PM, eighth floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/13/2016. (FNC) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-1912MOTION to Permit Discovery by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. (Rutherford, Russell) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-2013TEXT ORDER: The Defendant has advised the court that it would like to respond to the Motion to Permit Discovery (doc. 12). The court SETS July 26, 2016 as the deadline to respond. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7-20-16. (AMW, ) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2614Opposition to 12 Motion to Permit Discovery filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Long, Don) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Scheduling Conference held on 7/28/2016. (FNC) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-07-2915ORDER -re: Motion to Permit Discovery 12 . The court DENIES the motion without prejudice to revisiting it at a later stage. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/29/2016. (AVC) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-2916SCHEDULING ORDER-Counsel shall file a Joint Status Report by 9/1/2016, updating the court on further production of records in response to the FOIArequests to HUD and any other relevant matters. The deadline for dft to file its motion for summary judgment is 9/30/2016. The deadline for pltf to file its response to the motion is 10/21/2016. After the ruling on the motion for summary judgment, the court will set a new scheduling/status conference to discuss further proceedings and deadlines.Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/29/2016. (AVC) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-09-0117STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Long, Don) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-2118MOTION for Extension of Time (Opposed) by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Long, Don) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-2319RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION for Extension of Time (Opposed) filed by Navigate Affordable Housing Partners Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HUD Annual FOIA Report)(Rutherford, Russell) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-2620ORDER Setting Motion Hearing re: 18 for Monday, October 3, 2016 at 01:30 PM, CR 8, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/26/2016. (FNC) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-3021NOTICE of Appearance by Lane H Woodke on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Woodke, Lane) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2016 re 18 MOTION for Extension of Time (Opposed) filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. Parties are to submit joint report on how to resolve this document production issue by October 12. Court adj. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (FNC) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-1322ORDER re 18 MOTION for Extension of Time- The court SUSPENDS the deadlines in its Scheduling Order regarding submission of the motion for summary judgment and response. Despite that suspension, the court DEFERS ruling on HUD's motion for extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment, noting that the request of a four-month extension until January 31, 2017 is a lengthy one and the court has not yet received information justifying such a long delay. The court ORDERS counsel to submit another Joint Status Report to the court on or before Thursday, November 3, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/13/16. (SAC ) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-2723Joint MOTION for Protective Order by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order 502(d) Protective Order)(Long, Don) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-2824PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/28/2016. (FNC) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-11-1825Joint MOTION for Entry of a Revised Scheduling Order by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Long, Don) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-1826ORDER re 25 Motion for Entry of a Revised Scheduling Order- The court GRANTS the motion and sets the deadlines as outlined within. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/18/16. (SAC ) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-2127ORDER finding as moot 18 Motion for Extension of Time, in light of the Order entering a revised scheduling order (doc. 26) based on the parties' joint motion (doc. 25). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11-21-16. (AMW, ) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2017-07-1328Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Long, Don) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1429SCHEDULING ORDER. The court GRANTS 28 and amends the scheduling order as follows: Dispositive motions due 1/15/2018 with responses due 2/6/2018, as further set out herein. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 7/14/2017. (FNC) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff