Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Few, The Proud, The Forgotten et al v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2016cv00647
Date Filed2016-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Victor A. Bolden
PlaintiffThe Few, The Proud, The Forgotten
PlaintiffVietnam Veterans of America
PlaintiffConnecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America
Case DescriptionThe Few, the Proud, the Forgotten, a veterans organization focused on obtaining disability benefits for Marines stationed at Camp Lejeune who were exposed to contaminated water, and the Connecticut Council of Vietnam Veterans of America submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the agency's Subject Matter Expert program pertaining to the Camp Lejeune claims. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the veterans' organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [39]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Connecticut has ruled that the Department of Veterans Affairs has not shown that it conducted an adequate search for records responding to a multi-part request concerning the use of Subject Matter Experts to adjudicate disability claims stemming from contaminated drinking water at Camp Lejeune and has agreed that the veterans' organizations who brought the suit may conduct discovery if currently uncompleted searches do not satisfy them. Concerned that the rate of successful claims had dropped from 25 percent to eight percent, several veterans' organizations submitted the requests to the agency. The agency divided responsibility for responding to the request between the Veterans Benefits Administration and the Veterans Health Administration. After a number of searches, the agency provided some records, withholding personally-identifying records about SMEs under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The veterans' organizations argued the agency had not shown why it divided the request for search purposes. The court agreed, noting that "at this stage of the litigation, the Court cannot conclude that this allocation of labor was a reasonable response to Plaintiffs' request. Defendant delegated the claims-related paragraphs of the FOIA request to VBA because of VBA's focus on claims adjudication, rather than management of the SME program and the SMEs. As Plaintiffs noted, however, Defendant's declarations do not adequately explain why VBA would not have records responsive to more general questions concerning the SME program. . ." The court faulted the VBA for failing to describe its file system, its decision to limit the search to certain offices, and its failure to use certain obvious keywords. The court observed that the agency's affidavits "do not explain why VBA excluded the term 'Subject Matter Expert' when searching for responses to a FOIA request concerning the Subject Matter Expert program. Without this 'explanation,' the Court cannot conclude that the search was 'adequate.'" Assessing the search done by VHA, the court agreed with the plaintiffs that the component had not sufficiently shown personal knowledge of the records search by the individuals who signed the affidavits. The court pointed out that it "cannot hold as a matter of law that the three declarations from VHA officials are based on sufficient 'personal knowledge' to support a motion for summary judgment. This is especially true because the declarations provide few details about the searches in question." The agency had redacted all information about the SMEs, including their qualifications. The court noted that "Defendant does not describe a privacy interest relating to the SME's qualifications and submits no information suggesting that such disclosure would subject SMEs to harassment or threats. Plaintiffs articulate a public interest in the disclosure of SMEs' qualifications, but do not describe a separate public interest in the disclosure of other identifying details. Because Defendant represented at oral argument that it will produce additional records in response to Plaintiffs' inquiry about the qualifications of the SMEs, the Court will not address whether Exemption 6 would permit redaction of the SMEs' names, if Defendant produced no additional records establishing their qualifications." The court expressed hope that the parties could settle their remaining differences, but indicated that it would grant limited discovery if the agency's further responses were not satisfactory.
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Search - Detailed description of search
Opinion/Order [64]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-271COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3978821.), filed by The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America Connecticut State Council, Vietnam Veterans of America.(Parkin, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-27Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-272STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/27/2016.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-273ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/27/2016.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-274NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Standing Protective Order, 1 Complaint, filed by Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2016.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-27Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Parkin, Jason) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-295ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jason Parkin* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization* *Yale Law School, PO Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 4/29/2016 (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-04-296ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jason Parkin* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization* *Yale Law School, PO Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 5/4/2016 (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-047ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Jason Parkin* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization, Yale Law School* *PO Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-06-098NOTICE of Appearance by John W Larson on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs (Larson, John) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-099Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 11, 2016, to File Responsive Pleading re 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-1010ORDER granting 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 11, 2016, to File Responsive Pleading re 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/10/2016. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-13Answer deadline updated for United States Department of Veterans Affairs to 7/11/2016. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-2711SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, Vietnam Veterans of America. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 5/9/2016, answer due 7/11/2016. (Parkin, Jason) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-2912NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-2913MOTION for Jason Parkin to Withdraw as Attorney by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Parkin, Jason) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-3014ORDER granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Parkin terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/30/3016. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-1115Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2016, to respond to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1116NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Paul Wenzloff on behalf of Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1217ORDER granting 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2016 to respond to 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/12/2016. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2016-07-12Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to 7/18/2016. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2016-07-1818ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.(Larson, John) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-08-0819MOTION for Status Conference by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-0920ORDER granting 19 Motion for a Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2016 at 11:30 am. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/9/2016. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-0921NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2016 11:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-2622Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 8/26/2016. Total Time: 8 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Montini.) (Dearing, S.) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-2623SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the Telephonic Status Conference held today, the Court sets the following deadlines: Production of all documents, including those from the VBA and VHA, must occur by 9/23/2016; Production of search declarations and Vaughn Indices must occur by 10/28/2016; Plaintiffs must notify Defendant of any objections to the discovery provided by 11/10/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2016; any Opposition to Dispositive Motions is due by 1/13/2017; any Reply to such motions is due by 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/26/2016.(Dearing, S.) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-12-0724Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 23, 2016, to File Dispositive Motion 23 Scheduling Order,, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-0825ORDER granting 24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time and modifying 23 Scheduling Order. Dispositive motions to be filed by 12/23/2016; opposition due 1/27/2017 and reply brief due 2/10/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/8/2016. (Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-2326MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Responses due by 1/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts)(Larson, John) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2017-01-2627MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Intern Rory M. Minnis by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Client Consent to Appearance of Law Student Intern R. Minnis)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-2628MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Intern Helen E. White by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Client Consent to Appearance of Law Student Intern H. White)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-2729ORDER granting 27 Motion to Appear. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/27/2017.(Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2730ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appear. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/27/2017.(Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-2731Memorandum in Opposition re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-02-1032REPLY to Response to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephania Griffin)(Larson, John) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-2033Consent NOTICE by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America of Request for Oral Argument RE: 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wenzloff, Aaron) Modified on 2/21/2017 (Blough, B.). (Entered: 02/20/2017)
2017-04-0534NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing on motion for summary judgment set for 4/24/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-1735Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Intern Shikha Garg by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Client Consent to Appearance of Law Student Intern S. Garg)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-1736Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Intern Diana Lee by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Client Consent to Appearance of Law Student Intern D. Lee)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-1937ORDER granting 35 Motion to Appear as Law Student Intern; granting 36 Motion to Appear as Law Student Intern. The Court notes that the appearance of Ms. Garg and Ms. Lee may not comply with Local Rule 83.9(c)(2), which requires Law Student Interns to have completed "legal studies amounting to at least two semesters of credit," but grants Plaintiffs' motion based on the representation that the law student interns are sufficiently close to compliance, such that the impact on this requirement is de minimis. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/19/2017. (Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-2438Minute Entry Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2017; taking under advisement 26 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Total Time: 1 hours and 21 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Perez, J.) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-2639ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/26/2017.(Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-1640First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 10 & 24, 2017, to Comply with 39 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-1941ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time. Supplemental document production due 7/10/2017, supplemental search declarations due 7/24/2017. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/19/2017.(Ghosh, S.) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-09-2642Consent MOTION for Status Conference by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2743ORDER granting 42 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/27/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-2744NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/4/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-10-0445Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 10/4/2017. 9 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-04Defendant's supplemental declarations due by 10/20/2017. Defendant's document production due by 01/12/2018. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/04/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-0446NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-2347NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 1:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. RESET FROM 11/8/2017 at 10:30 AM . Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-2448MOTION for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Ashley E. Ingram. by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Student Appearance Certification)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-2449MOTION for Leave to Appear Student Attorney Corey M. Meyer. by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Student Appearance Certfication)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-2550ORDER granting 48 Motion to Appear as to Student Attorney Ashley E. Ingram. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/25/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-2551ORDER granting 49 Motion to Appear as to Student Attorney Corey M. Meyer. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/25/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-11-0852Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 11/8/2017. 9 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-0853NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 03:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-12-0654AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 12/14/2017 3:30 Status Conference set for 12/14/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-1155ORDER cancelling 54 Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/11/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1356NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-1957Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 12/19/2017. 13 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-1958NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing set for 1/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-1959ORDER. On October 4, 2017, the Court ordered that all document production be completed by 1/12/2018. In the event that all documents are not produced by the deadline, the Court ORDERS the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to make available a representative from the Agency with the appropriate authority and technical knowledge to testify in person at the 1/17/2018 hearing about why production has been delayed as long as it has and to provide a schedule for the efficient resolution this matter. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/19/2017. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-01-1060Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-1161ORDER granting 60 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/11/2018. Calendar entry to follow. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-1162NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 1/17/2018 at 10:00 . Hearing regarding discovery compliance set for 1/31/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-3163Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 1/31/2018. 17 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (McDonough, S.) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-0164ORDER. Having conducted a hearing regarding outstanding discovery on January 31, 2018, and upon further consideration, the Court orders the following: (1) Plaintiffs will submit additional search terms to the Defendant by February 7, 2018; (2) separately, the parties will file a status report with the Court on February 14, 2018; and (3) the parties and representatives from the Department of Veterans Affairs would return to Court for a follow-up hearing on Monday, February 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 of the Brien McMahon Federal Building, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/1/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-0165NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. In Person Status Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-1466STATUS REPORT by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-1567MOTION for Extension of Time nunc pro tunc re 64 Order,, by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1568STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1569MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order,, (Motion to Modify) by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Responses due by 3/8/2018 (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1570NOTICE by United States Department of Veterans Affairs re 69 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order,, (Motion to Modify) - Request for Expedited Consideration of Motion (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1571NOTICE by United States Department of Veterans Affairs re 68 Status Report - Notice of Corrected Figure (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1572RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion to Modify Order filed by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1673ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time nunc pro tunc . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/16/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1674ORDER. The Court will issue a ruling re 69 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order by 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/16/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1675Memorandum in Opposition re 69 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order,, (Motion to Modify) filed by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1676MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Contempt or, in the Alternative, Why a Stay Should Issue by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1777REPLY to Response to 69 MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order,, (Motion to Modify) filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/17/2018)
2018-02-2078TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motions Hearing. Held on 4/24/17 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: S. Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (Montini, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2079TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 10/4/17 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (Montini, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2080TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 11/8/17 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (Montini, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2081TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference. Held on 12/19/17 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (Montini, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2082TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Status Conference. Held on 1/31/18 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (Montini, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2083ORDER denying 69 Motion to Amend/Correct. As noted in this Court's February 1, 2018, Order, "the parties agreed to the following: (1) Plaintiffs would submit additional search terms to the Defendant by February 7, 2018; (2) separately, the parties would file a status report with the Court on February 14, 2018; and (3) the parties and representatives from the Department of Veterans Affairs would return to Court for a follow-up hearing on Monday, February 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m." ECF No. 64 at 3. Consistent with this Order, and since (1) and (2) from this Order have been satisfied, the parties and representatives shall return to Court for a follow-up hearing on Monday, February 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. At that follow-up hearing, where necessary, Department of Veterans Affairs personnel will be required to appear in person, and the Court will address any pending motions and determine what further actions are required to ensure full compliance with this Court's May 26, 2017, Order. See ECF No. 39 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/20/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2184First MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Intern Jacob Gelman by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Law Student Intern Appearance)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-2285ORDER granting 84 Motion to Appear. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/22/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-2686Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2018 re 76 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Contempt or, in the Alternative, Why a Stay Should Issue filed by Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America. Total Time: 0 hours and 55 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2687ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Contempt or, in the Alternative, Why a Stay Should Issue. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/10/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/26/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2688NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing re 87 Order to Show Cause set for 4/10/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-0289MOTION for Extension of Time until March 27, 2018, to File Status Report by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0590ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/27/2018. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/5/2018. (McDonough, S.) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-1691TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Status Conference. Held on 2/26/18 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2018. (Montini, S.) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-2692STATUS REPORT by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2793STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of OTSC)(Larson, John) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-0694NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. Counsel should be prepared to discuss how they wish to proceed at the Order to Show Cause hearing set for 4/10/2018 at 11:00 AM. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-0995Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America re 76 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Contempt or, in the Alternative, Why a Stay Should Issue . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-0996Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 76 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Contempt or, in the Alternative, Why a Stay Should Issue filed by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1097Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/10/2018. Total Time: 1 hours and 5 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1998ORDER denying 76 Motion for Civil Contempt without prejudice. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/19/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-1999NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 8/24/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 9/28/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-11100RESPONSE re 98 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause - Defendant's Plan for Compliance filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11101RESPONSE re 96 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 95 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law,, filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-06-07102Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule re 99 Calendar Entry,,,, 98 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Responses due by 6/28/2018 (Larson, John) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-13103ORDER granting 102 Motion. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/13/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-25104Joint STIPULATION & Proposed Order by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-25105AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: see attached Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-25106NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/11/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. Status Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Status Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Riegel, J.) Modified on 6/27/2018 to correct 2019 date (Perez, J.). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-25107ORDER endorsing 104 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/25/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-06108STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-09109MOTION for Extension of Time until July 20, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-10110ORDER granting 109 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/10/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10111NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 7/11/2018 at 10:00 AM . Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-19112MOTION for Aaron Wenzloff to Withdraw as Attorney by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America, The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-20113ORDER granting 112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aaron Paul Wenzloff terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/20/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-20114Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 7/20/2018. Total Time: 0 hours and 5 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-09115Joint MOTION Modify re 105 Scheduling Order by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Responses due by 8/30/2018 (Larson, John) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10116ORDER granting 115 Motion Modify 105 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/10/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-10117NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM . Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13118NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM . Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-17119STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-29120ORAL MOTION for Order to designate Michael J. Wishnie as clinical supervisor for the Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization by Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America and The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-29121Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: granting 120 Motion for Order; Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2018 re 120 MOTION for to designate Michael J. Wishnie as clinical supervisor for the Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Order filed by The Few, The Proud, The Forgotten, Connecticut State Council of Vietnam Veterans of America; Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/29/2018. Total Time: 0 hours and 9 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-29122SCHEDULING ORDER: See attached Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/29/2018. (Riegel, J.) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-30123NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/25/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/19/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. In-person Status Conference set for 1/11/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-21124Monthly STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Larson, John) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-03ENTERED IN ERROR- Hearing set for 10/03/18 cancelled. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/03/18. (Ryan, Sarah) Modified on 10/3/2018 (Perez, J.). (Entered: 10/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar