Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSHERIDAN v. U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00805
Date Filed2016-04-29
Date Closed2017-09-29
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffRONALD L. SHERIDAN, JR.
Case DescriptionRonald Sheridan submitted a FOIA request to OPM for records concerning the Electronic Questionnaires for Investigation Processing database. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sheridan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-291COMPLAINT against U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616077339) filed by RONALD L. SHERIDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-102RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT served on 5/5/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/04/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/5/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2016.) (jf) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-06-013GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/1/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-024NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-065ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-10MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before 6/24/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/10/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-246Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-06-28MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before September 1, 2016; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross-motion on or before October 7, 2016; Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before November 4, 2016; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross-motion on or before December 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/28/2016. (lckbj2) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 10/7/2016. Response to Cross Motions due by 11/14/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 12/5/2016. Summary Judgment motions due by 9/1/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/4/2016. (tj) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-08-297Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and to Adjust Corresponding Deadlines by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-09-02MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgement. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this matter is amended as follows: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 9/13/2016; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross-motion on or before 10/19/2016; Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before 11/9/2016; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross-motion on or before 12/9/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/2/2016. (lckbj1) Modified on 9/2/2016 to correct deadline (znbn). (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-138MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Lawrence W. Anderson)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-10-139MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum by RONALD L. SHERIDAN, JR (jf) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-25MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 8 Motion for Summary Judgment, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this matter is amended as follows: Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion on or before 10/31/2016; Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before 12/1/2016; and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross-motion on or before 12/31/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/25/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-3110Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RONALD L. SHERIDAN, JR. (jf) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-10-3111Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by RONALD L. SHERIDAN, JR (jf) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-2912Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and to Adjust Remaining Briefing Deadlines by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-11-30MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ordered that the 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's reply in support of its 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's 11 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before 12/15/2016, and that Plaintiff's reply in support of his 11 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before 01/17/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on November 30, 2016. (lckbj2) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-1413Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Combined Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion) filed by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(H) Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-1414REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum (Duplicate to Docket Entry No. 13) filed by U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(H) Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2017-01-1715REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RONALD L. SHERIDAN, JR. (td) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-04-19MINUTE ORDER setting hearing on Defendant's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 11 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment for Tuesday, July 25, 2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on April 19, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-07-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2017, re 8 Defendants' motion for Summary Judgment and 11 Plaintiff's motion for Summary Judgment. Oral arguments heard and motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Barbara DeVico) (gdf) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-09-2916MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Defendant's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 11 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on September 29, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2917ORDER granting Defendant's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 11 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on September 29, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff