Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00863
Date Filed2016-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted five FOIA requests to the Secret Service for records concerning travel by VIPs. The agency acknowledged receipt of all five requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-061COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4517221) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Designation of Related Civil Case, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-06Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sth) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-093LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/10/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/13/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/12/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/13/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/12/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-06-135MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's "Policy and Practice" Claim by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sealls, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-306Memorandum in opposition to re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's "Policy and Practice" Claim filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-117REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's "Policy and Practice" Claim filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Sealls, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2017-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Currently pending before the Court is defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Policy and Practice Claim 5 . I have already ruled on this issue in a related case between the same parties. 09/29/16 Mem. Op. and Order, Judicial Watch v. DHS , 15-cv-1983. That decision is currently on appeal to the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals. Judicial Watch v. DHS , USCA # 16-5339. In the interest of judicial economy, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending resolution of that appeal. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/31/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff