Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00883
Date Filed2016-05-10
Date Closed2016-08-22
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for any records indicating whether high-ranking agency officials used alias email addresses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4521332) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-10Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (sth) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/16/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/17/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-06-165ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-166SCHEDULING ORDER. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/16/16. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/5/2016. (tb) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-08-057Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall produce to plaintiff any responsive, non-exempt records by not later than August 12, 2016; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than September 12, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/5/16. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2016. (jth) (Entered: 08/06/2016)
2016-08-228STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff