Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00886
Date Filed2016-05-10
Date Closed2017-03-01
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Geological Survey for records concerning the management of animal care and use program at the National Wildlife Health Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. PEER contacted the agency to check on the status of the request and the agency said it had not yet started processing the request. PEER then filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4521690) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US Attorney DC, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons Agency, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-102Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-103NOTICE of filing exhibit to complaint by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - administrative appeal)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (dr) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-114SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/16/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/20/2016) (jf). (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/17/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/20/2016) (jf). (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY served on 5/15/2016 (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-098NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-159Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 9 consent motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 15, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2016.(lcabj3) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-08-1210Consent MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 10 consent motion to stay. The parties shall file a joint status report on September 23, 2016, to update the Court on the status of the matter, and to propose a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. All other deadlines in this matter are hereby STAYED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/12/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-09-2311Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 11 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by November 18, 2016, if the matter has not been dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/23/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-11-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of 12 the joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by January 18, 2017, if the matter has not been dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/18/16. (DMK) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 1/18/2017, if the matter has not been dismissed by then. (jth) (Entered: 11/20/2016)
2017-01-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a further joint status report by February 17, 2017, if the matter has not been dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/18/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-02-1714Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a further joint status report by March 10, 2017, if the matter has not been dismissed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/17/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-03-0115STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff