Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00904
Date Filed2016-05-12
Date Closed2016-10-26
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning flights taken by members of Congress to Cuba. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-121COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4524924) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Defense)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-12Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/16/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/17/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 5/16/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-05-265NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-06-146MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 6 defendant's motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 18, 2016. The Court notes, however, that future filings should comply more fully with Local Civil Rule 7(m). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/14/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint by 7/18/2016. (jth) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-07-187ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-18MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. In light of defendant's representation that, as of July 14, 2016, "all available responsive records" have been released "without redaction," Answer [Dkt. # 7] at 1, the parties shall meet and confer, and file a status report by August 1, 2016, to inform the Court of whether there remain any issues to be adjudicated in this matter. The status report should propose a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/18/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-08-018Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 8 status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 23, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/2/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-239Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 12, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/23/2016.(lcabj3) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-09-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 28, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-10-2511NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-2612STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff