Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHigh Sierra Hikers Association, Inc., v. National Park Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2016cv02609
Date Filed2016-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffHigh Sierra Hikers Association, Inc
Case DescriptionThe High Sierra Hikers Association submitted a FOIA request to the National Park Service for records concerning the agency's Wilderness Stewardship Plan for Sequoia and Kings Canyon National Parks. The agency provided an interim response, but withheld some records. The Association continued to pursue the request, but was never able to get the agency to provide a complete response, which would have provided a right of appeal. The Association then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Park Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against National Park Service. Fee received 0971-10450704 $400.00; Filed by High Sierra Hikers Association, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/13/2016) Modified on 5/16/2016 (kk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/16/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-132Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/13/2016) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-133Statement of Corporate Interest by High Sierra Hikers Association, Inc.,. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/13/2016) Modified on 5/16/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-164Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 5/31/2016. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-165Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-166Summons Issued as to National Park Service. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-177AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against National Park Service. Filed byHigh Sierra Hikers Association, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/17/2016) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-178AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) (REDLINED) against National Park Service. Filed byHigh Sierra Hikers Association, Inc. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/17/2016) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-239MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth A. Holmes ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10472887.) filed by High Sierra Hikers Association, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/23/2016) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-05-2310MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Daniel C. Snyder ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10472927.) filed by High Sierra Hikers Association, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/23/2016) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-05-2411CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by High Sierra Hikers Association, Inc.. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-2412ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elisabeth A. Holmes. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-2413ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel C. Snyder. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-06-0714CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by High Sierra Hikers Association, Inc re 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,, 6 Summons Issued PROOF OF SERVICE (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 6/7/2016) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-2015Federal Defendant's Answer to Amended Complaint by National Park Service. (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2016) Modified on 6/21/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2016CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Park Service.. (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2016) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-07-2017ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (by Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Holmes, Elisabeth) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2018ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2119NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2016) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-2120STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE AND RELATED DATES filed by National Park Service. (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2016) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-2221ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on August 4, 2016 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2622ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 20 Stipulation CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE AND RELATED DATES. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-26Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/27/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-2923ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 8/4/2016 at 10:00 AM is off calendar and rescheduled to 10/25/2016 at 10:00 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-2924STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT AND FOIA RECORD PRODUCTION filed by National Park Service. (Pyle, Michael) (Filed on 8/29/2016) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-3025ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 24 Stipulation ON CASE MANAGEMENT AND FOIA RECORD PRODUCTION. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-10-2526ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference was not held - off calendar (see ECF Dkt. # 25 ). (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff