Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE v. AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00946
Date Filed2016-05-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cornucopia Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Agricultural Marketing Service for records concerning Redland Dairy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for a clarification. The Cornucopia Institute clarified the type of records it was seeking. The agency told the Cornucopia Institute that it might need to provide predisclosure notification to businesses identified in the records. The Cornucopia Institute then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-191COMPLAINT against AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4534981) filed by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-19Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (dr) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(dr) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-06-023NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-094NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-245Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 22, 2016 by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 5 unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 22, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/27/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-08-196ANSWER to Complaint by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-227ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before September 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/22/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-078MOTION for Briefing Schedule by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-07MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 8 consent motion for a briefing schedule. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by November 7, 2016. Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross-motion and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by December 19, 2016. Defendant's reply, combined with its opposition, and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by January 19, 2017. Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be filed by February 10, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/7/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-11-039Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File MSJ by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-04MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 9 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by December 19, 2016. Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross-motion and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by January 12, 2017. Defendant's reply in support of its motion, combined with any cross-opposition and supported by a single memorandum, shall be filed by February 9, 2017. And plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by March 9, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/4/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-12-1910MOTION for Summary Judgment by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bridges Decl, # 2 Exhibit Redland Dairy, # 3 Declaration Vaughn Index, # 4 Declaration Michaels Decl)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2017-01-0411Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and to Modify Briefing Schedule by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-05MINUTE ORDER granting 11 plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment, combined with any cross-motion, shall be filed by January 26, 2017. Defendant's reply in support of its motion, combined with any cross-opposition, shall be filed by February 23, 2017. And plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be due by March 23, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/5/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-1912Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Modify Briefing Schedule by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-20MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 12 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment, combined with any cross-motion, shall be filed by February 13, 2017. Defendant's reply in support of its motion, combined with any opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion, shall be filed by March 14, 2017. Plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by April 10, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/20/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-02-1113Consent MOTION to Stay by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2017)
2017-02-13MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay. This case is hereby STAYED until April 14, 2017. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report informing the Court as to the status of this action by April 14, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/13/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-04-1114MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a further joint status report by June 15, 2017. This matter remains STAYED pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/12/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-06-1515PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by September 12, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross motion and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by October 16, 2017. Defendant's reply, combined with any cross-opposition and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by November 17, 2017. And plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by December 18, 2017. This matter is no longer stayed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the new briefing schedule and the narrowing of the issues in this case, defendant's 10 motion for summary judgment is denied without prejudice as moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff