Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00956
Date Filed2016-05-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Lawyers Association submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the random selection process for H-1B work visas. USCIS located 521 pages of responsive records. The agency withheld 127 pages in full and 228 pages in part under Exemption 3 (other statutes), Exemption 4 (confidential business information), and Exemption 5 (privileges). The Association appealed the decision. In response to the appeal, the agency disclosed one page in full and 218 pages that were almost completely redacted in part. The Association then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4536488) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for DHS, # 3 Summons Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 4 Summons Summons for US Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons for USCIS, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-203MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kate Ellen Schwartz, :Firm- Hughes Socol Piers, :Address- 70 West Madison Street, Suite 4000, Chicago, IL 60602. Phone No. - (312) 580-0100. Fax No. - (312) 604-2751 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4536585. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION (Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-204MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Jacob Piers, :Firm- Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd., :Address- 70 West Madison Street, Suite 4000, Chicago, IL 60602. Phone No. - (312) 580-0100. Fax No. - (312) 604-2751 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4536606. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION (Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-20Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sth) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-205SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-06-076NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 5/31/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Dellon, Leslie) Modified on 6/14/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/31/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-139RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/31/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Dellon, Leslie) Modified on 6/14/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/31/16. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1411STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/14/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kate Ellen Schwartz. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Kate Ellen Schwartz be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/14/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Jacob Piers. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Matthew Jacob Piers be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/14/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-2812Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-30MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall have up to and including August 1, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/30/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/1/2016. (tb) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-08-0113ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0914MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caryn C. Lederer, :Firm- Hughes Socol Piers Resnick and Dym, Ltd, :Address- 70 West Madison St. Suite 4000, Chicago IL, 60602. Phone No. - 312-580-0100. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4633031. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Caryn C. Lederer. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and Caryn C. Lederer be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/22/16. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-1315Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before October 13, 2016, advising the Court of issues that remain in dispute and indicating whether the parties will continue to confer or seek an Order from the Court setting a schedule for filing dispositive or other motions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/15/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2016. (tb) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-10-1316Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before December 13, 2016, advising the Court of issues that remain in dispute and indicating whether the parties will continue to confer or seek an Order from the Court setting a schedule for filing dispositive or other motions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/20/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/31/2016. (tb) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-12-1317Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 27, 2017, advising the Court of issues that remain in dispute and indicating whether the parties will continue to confer or seek an Order from the Court setting a schedule for filing dispositive or other motions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/16/2016. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2017. (tb) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2017-01-2718Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before March 27, 2017, advising the Court of issues that remain in dispute and indicating whether the parties will continue to confer or seek an Order from the Court setting a schedule for filing dispositive or other motions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/30/2017. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2017. (jth) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-03-2719Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-05-1220Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-06-1621Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 21 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by August 16, 2017, advising the Court of their recommendations on whether any further proceedings are needed. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/19/17.(lcrjl2) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a joint status report by 8/16/2017, advising the Court of their recommendations on whether any further proceedings are needed. (jth) (Entered: 07/09/2017)
2017-08-1622Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Schwartz, Kate) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff