Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01034
Date Filed2016-06-02
Date Closed2016-09-03
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for two Inspector General reports prepared in response to congressional inquiries into whether non-career officials at the agency had been improperly involved in the processing of FOIA requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, Cause of Action submitted a second FOIA request for records related to the agency's response to the congressional inquiries. After still hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-021COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4551846) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Vecchione, John) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-022Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-023MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alfred J. Lechner, Jr., :Firm- Cause of Action Institute, :Address- 1875 Eye St. NW Suite 800. Phone No. - 2024994232. Fax No. - 2023305842 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4551882. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vecchione, John) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (jd) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-034NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/3/2016) (ztd). (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-035REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE.(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-066SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 6/13/2016 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/13/2016. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-149RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/13/2016. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-07-1310NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-1311ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 7/29/16.Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/14/16. (DJS) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines : Parties' Joint Status Report due by 7/29/16. (kk) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-22MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2, which requires "a certification that the attorney [seeking admission] either HAS or HAS NOT BEEN DISCPLINED by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/22/16. (DJS) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-01MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 12 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/8/2016. Plaintiff's Response and, if necessary, Combined Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/29/2016. Defendant's Combined Reply/Response due by 10/20/2016. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/1/16. (DJS) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-09-0113STIPULATION of Dismissal by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0314ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties 13 , this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/3/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/03/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff