Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIERRA CLUB v. U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01075
Date Filed2016-06-08
Date Closed2016-10-04
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffSIERRA CLUB A Non-Profit Corporation
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers' Little Rock District for records of a permit issued under the Clean Water Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Sierra Club that there might be exempt information that would have to be reviewed at another office. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-081COMPLAINT against U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4560060) filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Certificate Rule 7.1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons US Atty, # 4 Summons Summons Atty General, # 5 Summons Summons US Army Corps)(Henry, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-06-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (md) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-09Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-093STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/9/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-094SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/22/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2016. (Henry, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-076NOTICE of Appearance by Derrick Wayne Grace on behalf of U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-197Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise responde by U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-19MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's motion for enlargement of time to file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint 7 is hereby GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Monday, August 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/19/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/22/2016. (kt) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-08-188Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's consent motion for an extension of time 8 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/19/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 9/21/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-219STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint stipulation of dismissal, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/3/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff