Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01076
Date Filed2016-06-08
Date Closed2016-09-02
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPEER submitted a FOIA request to the National Park Service for records concerning gifts and free services received by Park Service Director Jonathan Jarvis from 2010 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4560139) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Agency Defendant, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Attorney DC)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-06-082Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-06-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-093SUMMONS I(3) ssued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-094SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-235NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-07-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 6/20/2016 (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/21/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-219ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-2110ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 4, 2016. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/21/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/4/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report advising the court of progress and suggesting next steps on or before September 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/05/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-09-0212STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff