Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTri-Valley Cares v. Department of Energy et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2016cv03197
Date Filed2016-06-10
Date Closed2017-06-23
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffTri-Valley Cares
Case DescriptionTri-Valley Cares submitted several FOIA requests to the National Nuclear Security Administration, a component of the Department of Energy, for records concerning various facilities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further, Tri-Valley Cares filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Energy
DefendantNational Nuclear Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10519545.). Filed byTri-Valley Cares. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 6/10/2016) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-102Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 6/10/2016) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-103Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 6/24/2016. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-144Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-145Summons Issued as to United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-156CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tri-Valley Cares.. (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 6/15/2016) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-227CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tri-Valley Cares to all Defendants (Yundt, Scott) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-07-208Federal Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-259CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/5/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2510CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration.. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/25/2016) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-08-1011CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on September 8, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel may appear by phone. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall (1-866-582-6878). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-2912ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-3113ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/31/2016) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-08-3114NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/31/2016) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-08-3115JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/31/2016) Modified on 9/2/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-0116ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Friday, September 9, 2016, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0117ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 15 Case Management Statement, filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/1/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0918ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on Friday, September 9, 2016, at 11:30 AM Pacific time is continued to 11/21/2016 at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-11-2219ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference is continued to 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM. Please use the same call-in information previously provided. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-2320Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/23/2016) Modified on 11/25/2016 (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-11-2521ORDER granting 20 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Energy & National Nuclear Security Administration. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/16/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/25/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2016) (Entered: 11/25/2016)
2017-02-0922ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conferences held by Howard Herman on 9/9/16 and 2/8/17. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-0923CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/9/2017) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-1024CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. The case management previously notice for 2/16/2017 has been rescheduled for 4/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1025ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/10/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-13CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-1326CLERK'S NOTICE A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/28/2017 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Parties should be prepared to select a Settlement Conference date. Appearances may be made by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-2827Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2017. Settlement Conference set for 4/27/2017 10:00 AM. The parties shall participate by phone. Telephone instructions will be provided separately by email. Between 4/13/2017 and 4/21/2017, counsel shall meet and confer by telephone. Settlement Conference Statements should by lodged at njvpo@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 4/13/2017. FTR Time 1:31-1:38. Plaintiff Attorney Scott Yundt by phone. Defendant Attorney Rebecca Falk by phone. This is a text only Minute Entry (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2017) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-04-0728CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Case Management Conference. In light of the settlement conference set for 4/27/2017, the court resets the 4/13/2017 CMC to 5/11/2017 at 11:00 a.m. and directs a short joint update by 5/4/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-2629STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEYS FEES filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-26Pursuant to the 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEYS FEES the Settlement Conference set for 4/27/2017 before Judge Vadas is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-04-2830Order signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 29 STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-30Set/Reset Hearing Status Conference set for 6/29/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. In light of the parties' settlement of all claims except the claim for fees, and to give the parties time to accomplish their timeline (set forth in their stipulated dismissal), the court vacates the 5/11/2017 initial CMC and sets a status conference on 6/29/2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/30/2017) (Entered: 04/30/2017)
2017-06-0731STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE FURTHER STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/7/2017) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-0832ORDER granting 31 Stipulation. In light of the parties' request to provide an update by 6/30/2017, the court vacates the 6/29/2017 CMC and resets it for 7/13/2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 6/8/2017) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-08Set/Reset Hearing Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 6/8/2017) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-2233STIPULATION RE: SETTLEMENT OF FOIA ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by United States Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/22/2017) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff