Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRCB International, Ltd. v. Labbeemint, Inc.
DistrictEastern District of Washington
CityYakima
Case Number1:2016cv03109
Date Filed2016-06-10
Date Closed2017-12-27
JudgeJudge Stanley A Bastian
PlaintiffRCB International, Ltd.
Case DescriptionRCB International filed suit against Labbeemint, Inc. claiming Labbeemint improperly used its technology in producing its mint oil. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantLabbeemint, Inc.
DefendantNorwest Ingredients Inc
DefendantCounter Claimant
Labbeemint, Inc.
DefendantRCB International, Ltd.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint
Opinion/Order [33]
Opinion/Order [43]
Opinion/Order [44]
Opinion/Order [50]
Opinion/Order [112]
Opinion/Order [123]
Opinion/Order [177]
Opinion/Order [265]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-141Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4569006 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by RCD International, Ltd. against Labbeemint, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons). (Love, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-142Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by RCD International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-153Summons Issued Electronically as to Labbeemint, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ljb) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-154Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/15/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/12/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 9/12/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ljb) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-285Affidavit of Service of Complaint, 1 , Summons Issued 3 upon Labbeemint, Inc. served on 4/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) Filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-196Notice of Appearance of Thomas A. Lerner appearing on behalf of Labbeemint, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Labbeemint, Inc. (Lerner, Thomas) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-197Joint Motion To Transfer To U.S. District Court For The Eastern District Of Washington (Yakima) Pursuant 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) . Filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-258ORDER: Granting Motion to Transfer 7 . This case shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Washington (Yakima). Signed on 5/25/2016 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (plb) [Transferred from Oregon on 6/10/2016.] (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-109Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 6:16-cv-00646. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-2010NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome R Aiken on behalf of RCB International, Ltd. (Attorney Jerome R Aiken added to party RCB International, Ltd.(pty:pla))(Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2011NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M Jost on behalf of Labbeemint, Inc. (Attorney Shannon M Jost added to party Labbeemint, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2012RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2013MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jeffrey S. Love. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2365077. by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2014MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Scott E. Davis. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2365100. by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2115ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-06-2316ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. It has been determined that this case should be reassigned to Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko for all further proceedings. The parties shall change the initials on the case number from SMJ to LRS on all future pleadings to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF ATTACHED.(BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-2717ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko has recused himself from this matter. Accordingly, it has been determined that this case should be reassigned to Judge Stanley A Bastian for all further proceedings. The parties shall change the initials on the case number from LRS to SAB on all future pleadings to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE.(BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-2818NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Thomas A Lerner on behalf of Defendant Labbeemint, Inc. (Lerner, Thomas) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-2819TEXT ORDER granting ECF No 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Jeffrey S. Love for RCB International, Ltd., Inc. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (JW, Operations Clk) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-2820TEXT ORDER granting ECF No. 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Scott E. Davis for RCB International, Ltd., Inc. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (JW, Operations Clk) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-0121MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2016 at 01:30 PM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-1822STIPULATION Regarding Protective Order by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-1923Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-1924MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Under LR 7.1(h)(2)(c) by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-1925MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Hearing by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-1926DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 24 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Under LR 7.1(h)(2)(c) , 25 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Hearing filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Pages 1-14, # 2 Exhibit B - Pages 15-21)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-2027Praecipe filed by Labbeemint, Inc.: Re 25 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Hearing . Description: Filing signature page to motion. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2028MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 25 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Hearing by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aiken, Jerome). Filer called and indicated this filing should not have been linked to ECF No. 25 . Modified on 7/20/2016 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2129RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 25 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Heari filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-2530MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Hearing filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2531First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Labbeemint, Inc.. Filed by RCB International, Ltd..(Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2632REPLY MEMORANDUM re 25 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss is Resolved, and Requesting Expedited Hearing filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-0133ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS. Denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 24 Motion to Expedite; denying as moot 25 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0234MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2016 at 11:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-0235AMENDED ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-0536MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Renewed Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is Resolved by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-0537MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is Resolved by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-0538DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 37 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is Resolved filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Pages 5-15, # 2 Exhibit B - Pages 16-22)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-0839ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE. Granting 36 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-1140RESPONSE to Motion re 37 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is Resolved filed by All Plaintiffs. (Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-1241REPLY MEMORANDUM re 37 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is Resolved filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-1242DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 37 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Until the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is Resolved filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-1543ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Granting 37 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1744ORDER DENYING STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Denying 23 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-1845LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report Joint Report Under FRCP 26(f) by RCB International, Ltd.. (Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-2346RESPONSE to Motion re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-2347DECLARATION by Arie Pellikaan in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-09-0648REPLY MEMORANDUM re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Chart)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-2149Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2016 re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-2750ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS. Denying 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-10-1151Defendant Labbeemint, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against RCB International, Ltd. by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Pages 24-30))(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-2052NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on September 21, 2016, in Yakima before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Page Numbers: 1-35 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Lynette Walters at 509-573-6613 or Lynette_Walters@waed.uscourts.gov . Redaction Request due 11/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2017. (Walters, Lynette) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-2153SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2016 at 10:15 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Conset to Magistrate)(LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-11-0454LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report Supplemental Joint Report with Labbeemint and by RCB International, Ltd.. (Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-0455RCB ANSWER to Counterclaim by Labbeemint with jury demand. by RCB International, Ltd..(Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-1556Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Scheduling Conference held on 11/15/2016. (Reported/Recorded by: Not Reported) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-1557JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 at 09:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2017-02-2158NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry;no PDF document. - By Court: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 2/23/2017 at 2:15 PM before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Counsel may participate by calling the Court Conference Line: 1-888-636-3807; Access Code: 8839796; Security Code: 3109.(LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2259MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sarah E. Jelsema. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2549817. by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aiken, Jerome) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2360TEXT ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Sarah E. Jelsema for RCB International, Ltd. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-2361Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Discovery Hearing held on 2/23/2017. (Reported/Recorded by: Not Reported) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-0962MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Norwest Ingredients Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0963DECLARATION by Reid Johnson in Support re 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Norwest Ingredients Inc. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0964DECLARATION by Terry Cochran in Support re 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Norwest Ingredients Inc. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-2065MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2066STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2067DECLARATION by Arie Pellikaan in Support re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Pellikaan Decl (p. 5-23), # 2 Exhibit B to Pellikaan Decl (p.24-47), # 3 Exhibit C to Pellikaan Decl (p. 48-53), # 4 Exhibit D to Pellikaan Decl (p.54 -161) Proposed Sealed, # 5 Exhibit E to Pellikaan Decl (p.162-180) Proposed Sealed, # 6 Exhibit F to Pellikaan Decl (p.181-188) Proposed Sealed, # 7 Exhibit G to Pellikaan Decl (p.189-193), # 8 Exhibit H to Pellikaan Decl (p.194-196) Proposed Sealed)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2068DECLARATION by Dana Wendel in Support re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2069DECLARATION by John Wendel in Support re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to JWendel Decl (p. 11-13), # 2 Exhibit B to JWendel Decl (p. 14-16) Proposed Sealed, # 3 Exhibit C to JWendel Decl (p. 17-22) Proposed Sealed, # 4 Exhibit D to JWendel Decl (p. 23-38) Proposed Sealed, # 5 Exhibit E to JWendel Decl (p. 29-33) Proposed Sealed, # 6 Exhibit F to JWendel Decl (p. 34-38) Proposed Sealed)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2070DECLARATION by Kelly Vining in Support re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Vining Decl (p. 5-9), # 2 Exhibit B to Vining Decl (p. 10-11))(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2071DECLARATION by Grower in Support re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction - Proposed Sealed filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Grower Decl (p. 6-9) - Proposed Sealed, # 2 Exhibit B to Grower Decl (p. 10-15) Proposed Sealed)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2072Motion to Seal by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2374Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Norwest Ingredients, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-2375RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-2376MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-2377DECLARATION by Jeffrey S. Love in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Love Decl (p. 4-7), # 2 Exhibit B to Love Decl (p. 8-17), # 3 Exhibit C to Love Decl (p. 18-37))(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-2778Praecipe filed by Norwest Ingredients Inc: Re 64 Declaration in Support of Motion, 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena . Description: The declaration was filed without a signature. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2779MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 74 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Norwest Ingredients, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed by Norwest Ingredients Inc. (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2880REPLY MEMORANDUM re 74 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Norwest Ingredients, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-2881DECLARATION by Jeffrey S. Love in Support re 74 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Norwest Ingredients, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoenas , specifically, RCB's Reply to Norwest's Opposition to the Motion to Expedite, filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Love Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Love Declaration)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-2982NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Johnson on behalf of Norwest Ingredients Inc (Attorney Reid Johnson added to party Norwest Ingredients Inc(pty:ip))(Johnson, Reid) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2983NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E Konkright on behalf of Norwest Ingredients Inc (Attorney Kelly E Konkright added to party Norwest Ingredients Inc(pty:ip))(Konkright, Kelly) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2984REPLY MEMORANDUM re 62 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Norwest Ingredients Inc. (Johnson, Reid) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-0385RESPONSE to Motion re 72 Motion to Seal filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-0386DECLARATION by Craig J. St. Hilaire in Support re 72 Motion to Seal filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-0387DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 72 Motion to Seal filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-0388ORDER GRANTING NORWEST INGREDIENTS INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS, granting 62 Motion to Quash; and denying 74 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-0689ORDER setting briefing schedule. Labbeemint shall file a response to RCBs motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 65 , and its cross-motion for summary judgment by April 10, 2017. RCB shall file its response to Labbeemints cross-motion for summary judgment by April 21, 2017. Labbeemints reply is due by May 1, 2017. The Court consolidates hearing on Labbeemints cross-motion for summary judgment with hearing on RCBs motion for summary judgment set for May 10, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-0690Joint MOTION to Expedite Consideration on Joint Motion to File Over Length Briefs on Summary Judgment by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-0691Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Summary Judgment Briefs by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-0792ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEFS, granting 90 Motion to Expedite; and granting 91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-1093MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1094STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment , 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1095DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED EXHIBITS) filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Pages 4-11, # 2 Exhibit B, Pages 12-61)(Jost, Shannon) Modified on 4/11/2017 - at request of counsel, corrected name of Exhibit B(SK, Case Administrator). (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1096DECLARATION by Craig J. St. Hilaire in Support re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED) filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1097DECLARATION by Don Labbee in Support re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED) filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1098DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment (Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d)) filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1099Motion to Seal by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-11Docket Annotation - Re Filing Error: 95 Declaration in Support of Motion. At request of counsel, the name of attached document "Errata B" was changed to reflect corrected name "Exhibit B". (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-21106REPLY MEMORANDUM re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment , 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-21107STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment , 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-24108RESPONSE to Motion re 99 Motion to Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-01109REPLY MEMORANDUM re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-08110NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Jacob A Zuniga on behalf of Labbeemint, Inc. (Attorney Jacob A Zuniga added to party Labbeemint, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Jacob A Zuniga added to party Labbeemint, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zuniga, Jacob) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-10111Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2017 re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Labbeemint, Inc., 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment and an Injunction filed by RCB International, Ltd. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-25112ORDER RE: PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 72 Motion to Seal; denying 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-25113MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of John Wendel, Dana Wendel, and Dr. Kelly Vining by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-25114DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 113 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of John Wendel, Dana Wendel, and Dr. Kelly Vining filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Pages 4-16, # 2 Exhibit 2, Pages 17-48, # 3 Exhibit 3, Pages 49-56, # 4 Exhibit 4, Pages 57-93, # 5 Exhibit 5, Pages 94-104)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-25115Submission of Proposed Order Re 113 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of John Wendel, Dana Wendel, and Dr. Kelly Vining filed by Labbeemint, Inc. ; filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-06-08116MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 113 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of John Wendel, Dana Wendel, and Dr. Kelly Vining filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-09117MOTION to Certify Order Dismissing Labbeemint's Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief as Final and Request for a Stay of Proceedings by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-15118REPLY MEMORANDUM re 113 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of John Wendel, Dana Wendel, and Dr. Kelly Vining filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-16119NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on May 10, 2017, in Yakima before Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Page Numbers: 1-55 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Lynette Walters at 509-573-6613 or Lynette_Walters@waed.uscourts.gov . Redaction Request due 7/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2017. (Walters, Lynette) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-23120MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Certify Order Dismissing Labbeemint's Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief as Final and Request for a Stay of Proceedings filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-30121REPLY MEMORANDUM re 117 MOTION to Certify Order Dismissing Labbeemint's Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief as Final and Request for a Stay of Proceedings filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-06122ORDER GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART LABBEEMINT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN WENDEL, DANA WENDEL, AND DR. KELLY VINING, granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-07123ORDER DENYING LABBEEMINT'S MOTION TO CERTIFY AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, denying 117 Motion to Certify. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-13124Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Depositions and RCB's Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motions Deadline by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-13125Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines Regarding Depositions and RCB's Request to Extend Deadlines Regarding Dispositive Motions by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-18126ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES, granting 124 Motion to Expedite; and granting 125 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-29127NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M Ritchie on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party RCB International, Ltd.(pty:pla))(Ritchie, Peter) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-09-01128MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01129STATEMENT OF FACTS re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01130DECLARATION by Jeffrey S. Love in Support re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01131DECLARATION by Arie Pellikaan in Support re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01132Motion to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Love, Jeffrey) STRICKEN per Text Order filed at ECF No. 150 Modified on 10/19/2017 (LR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-08134Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines to take Deposition by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-08135MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Joint Motion to Extend Deposition Deadline by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11136TEXT ORDER GRANTING 134 Joint Motion to Extend Deposition Deadline and 135 Motion to Expedite. The Court finds good cause to grant the motions and extends the discovery deadline to September 15, 2017. All other deadlines shall remain in place. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-22137RESPONSE to Motion re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-22138DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Pages 4-9, # 2 Exhibit B, Pages 10-14, # 3 Exhibit C, Pages 11-16, # 4 Exhibit C-1, Pages 17-25, # 5 Exhibit D, Pages 26-34, # 6 Exhibit E, Pages 35-39)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-22139STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-10-06140REPLY MEMORANDUM re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06141STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06142DECLARATION by Jeffrey S. Love in Support re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06143DECLARATION by Dr. Kelly Vining in Support re 128 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's First Counterclaim filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-10144MOTION to Expedite Motion for Leave to Submit a Surreply in Support of Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-10145MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Support of Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-11146STIPULATED NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS TO PELLIKAAN DECLARATION FILED WITH SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by RCB International, Ltd. re 132 Motion to Seal, 131 Declaration in Support of Motion, To Withdraw Motion To Seal Exhibits To Pellikaan Declaration Filed With Summary Judgment Motion [Stipulated] . Hearing set for 11/13/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Love, Jeffrey) Pursuant to direction from chambers, undersigned CA changed event type to a motion event and set for hearing without oral argument Modified on 10/16/2017 (LR, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-11147MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 145 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Support of Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-12148REPLY MEMORANDUM re 145 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Support of Labbeemint's Opposition to RCB's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-13149TEXT ORDER DENYING ECF No. 145 Motion for Leave to Submit a Surreply in Support of Labbeemints Opposition to RCBs Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING ECF No. 144 Defendants Motion for an Expedited Hearing. The Court is satisfied that this matter has been fully briefed. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-16Set Motion Hearing as to 146 Stipulated Notice to Withdraw Motion to Seal Exhibits to Pellikaan Declaration Filed with Summary Judgment Motion. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-19150TEXT ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 146 Stipulated Notice to Withdraw Motion to Seal Exhibits to Pellikaan Declaration Filed with Summary Judgment Motion. Plaintiffs Motion to Seal, ECF No. 132 , is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-23151MOTION in Limine by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23152DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 151 MOTION in Limine filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages 4-19, # 2 Exhibit Pages 20-29, # 3 Exhibit Pages 30-35)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23153DECLARATION by Sarah J. Armon in Support re 151 MOTION in Limine filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23154MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23155MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23156MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23157MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition by RCB International, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23158DECLARATION by Arie Pellikaan in Support re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source , 155 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant , 157 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition , 154 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23159Motion to Seal by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-30161Motion to Seal by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30163RESPONSE to Motion re 154 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30164MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 151 MOTION in Limine filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30165RESPONSE to Motion re 155 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30166RESPONSE to Motion re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30167RESPONSE to Motion re 157 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30168DECLARATION of Arie Pellikaan In Support Of re 164 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30169DECLARATION by Craig J. St. Hilaire in Opposition re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30170Motion to Seal by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30171DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Opposition re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source , 155 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant , 154 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent , 157 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Page 4, # 2 Exhibit B, Pages 5-8, # 3 Exhibit C, Pages 9-21)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30173Witness List by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30174Exhibit List by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30175Witness List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30176Exhibit List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-01177ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 128 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-01178Amended Witness List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-06179RESPONSE to Motion re 159 Motion to Seal Exhibits to Pellikaan Declaration Filed with Motions in Limine filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06180REPLY MEMORANDUM re 151 MOTION in Limine filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06181DECLARATION by Shannon M. Jost in Support re 151 MOTION in Limine filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06182Motion to Seal by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06183DECLARATION by Craig J. St. Hilaire in Support re 182 Motion to Seal filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06186OBJECTIONS re 176 Exhibit List by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06187OBJECTIONS re 178 Witness List by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06188REPLY MEMORANDUM re 154 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06189REPLY MEMORANDUM re 155 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06190REPLY MEMORANDUM re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06191REPLY MEMORANDUM re 157 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06192DECLARATION by Arie Pellikaan in Support re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source , 155 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant , 157 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition , 154 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J (Proposed Sealed), # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N (Proposed Sealed), # 6 Exhibit O)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06193OBJECTIONS re 174 Exhibit List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06194OBJECTIONS re 173 Witness List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06195BRIEF re 194 Objections To Defendant's Trial Witness List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06196DECLARATION of Arie Pellikaan In Support Of RCB's Objections To Labbeemint's Witness List re 195 Brief, 194 Objections by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06197Motion to Seal by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-09199Proposed Voir Dire by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09200TRIAL BRIEF by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09201Proposed Voir Dire by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09202TRIAL BRIEF by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09203Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Special Verdict Form submitted by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09204Proposed Jury Instructions And Proposed Verdict Form submitted by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Verdict Form)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-13205NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Bradford J Axel on behalf of Labbeemint, Inc. (Attorney Bradford J Axel added to party Labbeemint, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Bradford J Axel added to party Labbeemint, Inc.(pty:dft))(Axel, Bradford) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13206OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13207RESPONSE re 195 Brief by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13208Proposed Pretrial Order [Joint] by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13209RESPONSE re 187 Objections To RCB's Amended Trial Witness List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13210RESPONSE re 193 Objections re Defendant's Proposed Trial Exhibits by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13211RESPONSE to Motion re 170 Motion to Seal filed by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Zuniga, Jacob) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13212OBJECTIONS To Labbeemint's Designations Of Testimony by RCB International, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5)(Jelsema, Sarah) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13213RESPONSE re 186 Objections To RCB's Exhibit List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13214STIPULATION Pretrial Exhibit by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13215Additional Attachments to Main Document re 214 Stipulation Pretrial Exhibit by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-14216DECLARATION of Shannon M. Jost re 210 Response by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, LABBEEMINT00000186, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 6, Weller CV, # 7 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 9, LABEEMINT00001024-35, # 10 Exhibit 10, LABBEEMINT00000306-30, # 11 Exhibit 11, LABBEEMINT00000308-25, # 12 Exhibit 12, LABBEEMINT00000339-41)(Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14217Motion to Seal by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-17223Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Disputed Instructions submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20224Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2017 re 156 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Re Alleged Erospicata Source filed by RCB International, Ltd., 155 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Evidence re "Landowner" Permission To Take Plant filed by RCB International, Ltd., 151 MOTION in Limine filed by Labbeemint, Inc., 154 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence About Plant Patent filed by RCB International, Ltd., 157 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Re Alleged Unfair Competition filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-21225PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-22226NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry;no PDF document. - By Court: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Counsel may participate by calling the Court Conference Line: 1-888-636-3807; Access Code:8839796; Security Code: 3109.(LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-22227NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 20, 2017, in Yakima, Washington before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Page Numbers: 1-84 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Lynette F. Walters at 509-573-6613 or Lynette_Walters@waed.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (Walters, Lynette) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-24228Proposed Jury Instructions after Pretrial Conference submitted by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/24/2017)
2017-11-26229BRIEF On Hearsay Issues by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/26/2017)
2017-11-27230Counter Proposed Jury Instructions Labbeemint Objections to RCB's Proposed Additional Jury Instructions submitted by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-27231Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Status Conference held on 11/27/2017. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-27232Proposed Jury Instructions Regarding Erospicata Plant Patent submitted by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-28233ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL, granting 159 Motion to Seal, 161 Motion to Seal, 170 Motion to Seal, 182 Motion to Seal, 197 Motion to Seal, and 217 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28234Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit I)(LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28235Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28236Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28237Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28238Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28239Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Unredacted Brief)(LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28240Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28241Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28242Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28243Sealed Document. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28244ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE, granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion in Limine; denying 155 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 156 Motion in Limine; and taking under advisement 157 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-29245OBJECTIONS re 232 Proposed Jury Instructions And Counterproposals For Preliminary Instructions by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29246MOTION to Clarify re 244 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,, by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Jost, Shannon) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29247MOTION to Expedite Defendant's Motion for Modification or Clarification of Order on Motions in Limine by Labbeemint, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2017 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zuniga, Jacob) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29248RESPONSE to Motion re 246 MOTION to Clarify re 244 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,, To Labbeemint Motion For Modification and RCB Objections To Court's Order (ECF NO. 244) filed by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30249TEXT ORDER re: ECF No. 246. The Court will address Labbeemints Motion for Modification or Clarification, ECF No. 246, at the pre-trial meeting on December 4, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30250AMENDED DOCUMENT by RCB International, Ltd.. Plaintiff's Amended Deposition Designations . (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01251AMENDED DOCUMENT by Labbeemint, Inc.. Defendant's Amended Deposition Designations . (Zuniga, Jacob) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-01252AMENDED DOCUMENT by RCB International, Ltd.. Plaintiff's Second Amended Deposition Designations . (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-01253Second Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-03254STIPULATION Re: Chain of Custody of Plant and Oil Samples by RCB International, Ltd.. (Davis, Scott) (Entered: 12/03/2017)
2017-12-04255Amended Witness List (Trial) by Labbeemint, Inc.. (Zuniga, Jacob) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04256Witness List (In Order Expected To Testify) by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04257Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/2017. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04258Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Jury Trial Day 1 held on 12/4/2017. Jury Trial continues 12/5/2017 at 8:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04259Joint Exhibit List by RCB International, Ltd.. (Jelsema, Sarah) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-05261Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Jury Trial Day 2 completed on 12/5/2017. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (Attachments: # 1 Witness List, # 2 Exhibit List) (LMM, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05262ORDER. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-19263STIPULATION of Dismissal by RCB International, Ltd.. (Love, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-20264NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Day 2 of Trial. Proceedings held on December 5, 2017, in Yakima, Washington before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Page Numbers: 1-157 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Lynette F. Walters at 509-573-6613 or Lynette_Walters@waed.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2018. (Walters, Lynette) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-27265ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff