Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01104
Date Filed2016-06-14
Date Closed2016-10-05
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPEER submitted two FOIA requests to the Theodore Roosevelt National Park for records concerning a proposed radio tower to be constructed by Verizon. The agency provided a partial response, but after the agency failed to respond to PEER's inquiries about whether the agency would provide more records, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantTHEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-141COMPLAINT against THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4566299) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Agency Defendant, # 3 Summons US Attorney DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 1 Administrative Appeal, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 2 Fax Confirmation)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-14Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-07-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/21/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK served on 6/20/2016 (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-217NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-218ANSWER to Complaint by THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-08-089ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 22, 2016. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/08/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/22/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-2210Joint STATUS REPORT by THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-2211Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-23MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Consent Motion to Extend Parties' Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule. The parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/23/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/6/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-10-0412STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by THEODORE ROOSEVELT NATIONAL PARK. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff