Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01105
Date Filed2016-06-14
Date Closed2016-08-26
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionThis docket number appears to be a duplicate of 1:2016-cv-01104 involving the same parties.
Complaint issues: Housekeeping

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-141ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4566372) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Agency Defendant, # 3 Summons US Attorney DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit Ex 1. Administrative Appeal, # 6 Exhibit Ex 2. Fax Confirmation)(Dumais, Laura) Modified on 6/14/2016 (md). (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-143NOTICE of filing corrected case initiating documents by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Complaint, # 2 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Corrected Agency Defendant, # 4 Summons Corrected US Attorney DC, # 5 Summons Corrected US Attorney General, # 6 Exhibit Corrected Ex. 1 Administrative Appeal, # 7 Exhibit Corrected Ex. 2 Fax Confirmation)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-14Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-07-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/21/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 6/20/2016 (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-088NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-08-019Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Answer by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-01MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Answer to the Complaint. It is further Ordered that ECF No. 9-1 is now the operative Answer. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/01/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0110ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report not later than August 15, 2016. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 08/01/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-1511MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before October 14, 2016, updating the court on the status of searches and production of documents and, if appropriate, proposing a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/16/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-2612STIPULATION of settlement and dismissal by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff