Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01163
Date Filed2016-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted several FOIA requests to the Administration for Children and Families for records including appointment calendars and communications for two officials indicating contacts with various refugee organizations, and the number of unaccompanied children who were eligible to be removed. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4569814) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for HHS, # 4 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-16Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (md) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-163Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/20/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/29/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-07-067NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-208Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendant has up to and including August 22, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/25/2016. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/22/2016. (tb) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-08-229ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-2310STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/23/16. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-10-0511NOTICE of Joint Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-10MINUTE SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proposed schedule submitted in conjunction with the Joint Proposed Schedule 11 is APPROVED, and the parties are directed to file a status report and proposed joint schedule on or before 01/31/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/10/16. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
2016-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Joint Briefing Schedule due by 1/31/2017. Status Report due by 1/31/2017. (tb) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2017-01-3112Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report on or before 03/02/2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/02/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-03-0213Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Further Proposed Schedule 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another status report and proposed schedule on or before 03/31/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/08/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-3114Joint STATUS REPORT and Further Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Further Proposed Schedule 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another status report and proposed schedule on or before 05/08/2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/07/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties will file another Joint Status Report and proposed schedule by 5/8/2017. (jth) (Entered: 04/09/2017)
2017-05-0815Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-09MINUTE REPORT: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Further Proposed Schedule 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another status report and proposed schedule on or before 06/09/2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/09/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-06-0916Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-21MINUTE REPORT: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Further Proposed Schedule 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another status report and proposed schedule on or before 07/11/2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/21/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-1117Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Further Proposed Schedule 17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another status report and proposed schedule on or before 08/31/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/14/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff