Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01256
Date Filed2016-06-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted FOIA requests to intelligence agencies for records concerning their pre-publication review processes. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies either denied the ACLU's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver or failed to respond. The ACLU filed administrative appeals of those denials, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-211COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4576095) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-06-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (md) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-06-21Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-06-223SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-06-284MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin Robert Good, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, :Address- 125 Broad Street, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-549-2500. Fax No. - 212-549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4584776. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-285MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brett Max Kaufman, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, :Address- 125 Broad Street, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-549-2500. Fax No. - 212-548-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4584784. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 4 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Benjamin Robert Good is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 29, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 5 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Brett Max Kaufamn is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 29, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-07-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/6/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2016. (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 5, 2016. (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/6/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2212RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 7/5/2016 (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2616Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-27MINUTE ORDER granting 16 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants shall answer, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint, by no later than September 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 27, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2016-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer or other response due by 9/7/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-08-0117REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION.(Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0218SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (jf) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-3119NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. Attorney Benjamin Robert Good terminated. (Good, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-0720ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-3021STANDING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. The parties shall file a proposed schedule for future proceedings by no later than October 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/30/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order For Further Proceedings due by 10/7/2016. (mac) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-0422Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Schedule for Future Proceedings by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-04MINUTE ORDER granting 22 joint motion for an extension of time to file a proposed scheduling order. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order by no later than November 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/4/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2016. (mac) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-11-0423PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 21 Order Directing Parties to File a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed scheduling order, the parties are directed to file another joint proposed scheduling order by no later than April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/7/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2017-02-2324MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alex Abdo, :Firm- Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, :Address- 535 West 116th Street, Low Library, New York, New York 10027. Phone No. - 212-854-1128. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4852480. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-2325NOTICE of Appearance by Jameel Jaffer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-23MINUTE ORDER granting 24 motion for admission pro hac vice. Alex Abdo is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/23/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-04-0726PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order Directing Parties to File a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed scheduling order, the parties are directed to file another joint proposed scheduling order by no later than June 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/10/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/24/2017. (mac) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-06-2327PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-26MINUTE ORDER. In view of 27 the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, the parties are ORDERED to file another joint proposed scheduling order by no later than August 25, 2017 to update the Court on the status of defendants' productions and whether further litigation will be necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/26/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/25/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-08-2428STIPULATION of Dismissal of Several Agencies and Components by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2529PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-28MINUTE ORDER. In view of 29 the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, the parties are ORDERED to file another joint proposed scheduling order by no later than October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/28/2017.(lcegs3) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2017. (mac) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-10-2030PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Parker, Ryan) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-20MINUTE ORDER In view of 30 the parties' Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule, the parties are ORDERED to file another joint proposed briefing schedule by no later than December 15, 2017 to update the Court on the status of defendants' productions and whether further litigation will be necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/20/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/15/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff