Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOUSER v. CHURCH et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01142
Date Filed2016-06-22
Date Closed2018-12-31
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffGEORGE D. HOUSER
Case DescriptionGeorge Houser, a federal prisoner, submitted FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning himself. Dissatisfied with the agency's limited response, Houser filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDIANA CHURCH Public Liaison for Georgia, Freedom of Information Act Headquaters
TERMINATED: 06/22/2016
DefendantCASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE Disclosure Officer 10000699382
TERMINATED: 06/22/2016
DefendantEDWARD T. KILLEN Director, Office of Governmental Liaison
TERMINATED: 06/22/2016
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE As a Bureau of the Department of the Treasury
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
TERMINATED: 06/22/2016
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [35]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Reggie Walton has ruled that George Houser's failure to appeal the IRS's initial determination on his request because he did not receive it in prison does not prevent him from pressing that claim. However, Walton also found that Houser's claims for expedited processing and a fee waiver were moot because the agency had already responded to his request without charging any fees and that the agency had no obligation to further explain the records to him. Houser was convicted of health care and tax fraud. He sent a request to the IRS for records about himself and five corporate entities. The agency initially refused to process his request without an affirmation subject to perjury. After receiving such an authorization, the agency processed his request and sent him an encrypted CD containing responsive information. However, since BOP did not allow prisoners to have encrypted documents, the prison did not provide the CD to Houser. Instead, the agency subsequently provided him with hard-copies of the records. Asking Walton to dismiss Houser's suit, the agency argued that Houser failed to appeal its initial determination dated February 24, 2016. Houser argued that he never received the February 2016 letter until January 2017. Refusing to dismiss the count, Walton noted that "the plaintiff has submitted declarations sufficient to show that there is a genuine issue of material fact as to when he received the IRS's February 24, 2016 determination letter. Exhaustion is not a jurisdictional prerequisite, and in the circumstances of this case, the plaintiff cannot be expected to have pursued an administrative appeal of an agency determination he had not received prior to filing this lawsuit. Walton dismissed Houser's challenge to expedited processing "because the IRS already has processed the plaintiff's FOIA request, this Court no longer may entertain the plaintiff's request for expedited processing of that request." Rejecting Houser's fee waiver claim, he added that 'the IRS has processed the plaintiff's FOIA request and has released responsive records at no cost to the plaintiff." Walton also dismissed Houser's claim to force the agency to better explain the documents. Here, he pointed out that Houser "essentially demands an explanation from the IRS regarding the processing of his FOIA request. The plaintiff is therefore attempting not only to expand the scope of this FOIA case, but he is also requesting that the IRS create documents by responding to this request. The FOIA does not require either action on the part of the IRS. . ."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust
Opinion/Order [77]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-221COMPLAINT against DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE filed by GEORGE D. HOUSER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-222NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GEORGE D. HOUSER. Case related to Case No. 16-CV-804 RBW. (td) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-223MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-224PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-225ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $68.62 from Prison Account of George D. Houser and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/21/16. (td) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-226ORDERED that the complaint against the individual defendants Diana Church, Cassandra E. Knight-Paige and Edward T. Killen is Dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/21/16; (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (td). (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-22Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/2/16. (td) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-07-077SUMMONS Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-218RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 7/18/2016 (td) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-119MOTION to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Brenda Lee Rivers, # 4 Declaration of William M. Rowe)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-1210Order advising plaintiff to respond by 9/12/2016 to the 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by the INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, or the Court may treat the motion as conceded. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/12/16. (ms) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/12/2016 (hs) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-09-1211MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-16MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's 11 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his Response to 9 the defendants' MOTION to Dismiss is due by 11/11/2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/16/16. (ms) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 11/11/2016 (hs) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-11-1712MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-22MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his opposition to the defendants' 9 MOTION to Dismiss is due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/22/16. (ms) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-12-1313MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Partial Filing Fee Received from GEORGE D. HOUSER in the amount of $34.60, receipt number: 4616082014. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-15MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's 13 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his opposition or other response to the defendants' 9 MOTION to Dismiss is due by 12/23/2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/15/16. (ms) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-1514MOTION for Order to Set Defendants' Deadline to File a Reply by DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-1915MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (jf) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion to Set Defendants' Deadline to File a Reply in the Event the Plaintiff Files an Opposition to the Service's Motion to Dismiss 14 is granted in part. The plaintiff's opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 9] is due by December 23, 2016, and the Defendant's reply, if any, is due by January 11, 2017. The defendants' request that no further extensions be granted to the plaintiff to file his opposition or otherwise respond to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/20/16. (ms) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2716MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-1717MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2318MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-25MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's motions for extensions of time 15 16 17 18 are granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition or other response to defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss is due by 1/26/2017. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/25/17. (ms) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-3019Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-0120Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-1622MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-1721Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tobin, Olga) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-2723MOTION to Strike the Declaration of William M. Rowe 9 MOTION to Dismiss by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-02-2724MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE D. HOUSER (Attachments: # 1 Affidavits)(td) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-0325MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To The Plaintiff's Motion To Strike, Summary Judgment Motion And Any Related Briefing by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-0326ERRATA by GEORGE D. HOUSER 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE D. HOUSER. (td) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-06MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 25 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their opposition to plaintiff's motions to strike and for summary judgment, and their reply to plaintiff's opposition to their motion to dismiss, if any, are due by May 5, 2017. Plaintiff's 19 22 motions for extension of time are granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/6/17. (ms) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/5/2017. (hs) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-3127NOTICE of Time Delay To Apprise the Court of Difficulty Filing by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-03-3128MOTION to Seek the Court's Permission Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(B)to Address Defendant's Oppositions to Plaintiff's Eight and Ninth Extensions of Time by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-05-0529REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 23 MOTION to Strike 9 MOTION to Dismiss , 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Olga L. Tobin, # 2 Exhibit 1: Letter to Houser, # 3 Exhibit 2: USPS Delivery Confirmation)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-1930MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE D. HOUSER (jf) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-1631MOTION for Extension of Time to Assess Defendant's Additional Disclosure by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Main Document 31 replaced on 6/20/2017) (td). (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-07-07MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Seek the Court's Permission Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure[] 6(b)(1)(B) to Address Defendant's Oppositions to Plaintiff's Eighth and Ninth Extensions of Time 28 is DENIED. His Motion to Extend Time to Assess Defendants' Additional Disclosures 31 is DENIED. The basis of his request was his inability to view an encrypted disk, and defendant's counsel has mailed hard copies of the documents to him. See Tobin Decl. [ECF No. 29-1] 2-3, 5-6. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time 30 is GRANTED, and he shall file his reply to defendant's opposition to his motion for summary judgment by 7/28/2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/6/17. (ms) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/28/2017. (hs) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-08-0732REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE D. HOUSER. (td) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-1833MOTION for Extension of Time to Explain Delay in Completing Final Reply by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2834MOTION for Extension of Time for one day to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-09-2235MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 23 the plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Declaration of William M. Rowe; denying 24 the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 33 34 the plaintiff's motions for extensions of time; and granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Count One of the plaintiff's Complaint survives. By November 10, 2017, the defendant either shall file a renewed motion for summary judgment or shall propose a schedule for further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/22/17. (ms) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-10-1336MOTION for Order to Correct the Record by GEORGE D. HOUSER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(td)"Leave to file is granted" by Judge Walton (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-3037MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion to Correct the Record Nunc Pro Tunc by DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-3038Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Order to Correct the Record filed by DIANA CHURCH, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE. (Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-01MINUTE ORDER: The defendants' 37 Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/1/17. (ms) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-1339PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, EDWARD T. KILLEN, CASSANDRA E. KNIGHT-PAIGE. (Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of the defendant's unopposed Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings In This Case 39 , it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings are STAYED through February 8, 2018, at which time the defendant shall file a status report regarding: (a) the IRS' progress in addressing the plaintiff's concerns, (b) what issues remain in dispute, and (c) whether scheduling briefing as to a renewed motion for summary judgment by the IRS is needed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/18/17. (ms) Modified on 12/18/2017 (hs). (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-02-0840STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-0841MOTION to Extend Stay by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion to extend the stay 41 is GRANTED. All proceedings are stayed through May 9, 2018, at which time the defendant shall file a status report regarding: (a) the IRS' progress in responding to the plaintiff's FOIA request(s), (b) what issues remain in dispute, and (c) whether scheduling briefing as to a renewed motion for summary judgment by the IRS is needed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/9/18. (ms) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 5/9/2018 (hs) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-2042MOTION to keep record open by GEORGE D. HOUSER (td) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-05-0943Second STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-0944Second MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-10MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion to Correct the Record Demonstrating Defendants Receipt of Proper Requests AS of 10 July 2015 36 is DENIED. Contrary to the plaintiff's presumption, the Court did not find that the Internal Revenue Service did not receive his 2015 FOIA requests. Rather, the Court merely acknowledged that the IRS deemed the plaintiff's FOIA requests incomplete. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/9/18. (ms) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's 42 Motion to Keep the Record Open; is DENIED as moot, and the defendant's 44 motion to extend the stay is GRANTED. All proceedings in this case are STAYED until August 7, 2018, at which time the defendant shall file a third status report informing the Court of the status of its response to the plaintiff's FOIA requests. If the defendant intends to file a dispositive motion, its status report shall include a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/9/18. (ms) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 8/7/2018 (hs) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1045MOTION to Permit Allow Reply to any further Motions or Stays Sought by Defendant by GEORGE D. HOUSER; "Leave to file is granted" signed 5/10/18 by Judge Walton (td) Modified event title on 5/15/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1446MOTION to Allow Reply to any further Motions or Stays Sought by Defendant by GEORGE D. HOUSER (ztd) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-06-08MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's unopposed motions 45 46 are granted in part, and the plaintiff may, "[w]ithin 14 days of the date of service" of any future motion by the defendants for an extension of time, file an opposition or other response to the motion. Local Civil Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/8/18. (ms) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Entered in Error.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2018. Response to Dispositive/Cross Motions due by 8/17/2018. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2018. Reply due by 10/17/2018. (hs) Modified on 6/27/2018 (Dates should have been in related case CA 16-804)(hs). (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-08-0747NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kavitha Bondada on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Olga Tobin (Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-0748Third STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-0749Third MOTION to Stay by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-09MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of defendant's third status report, ECF No. 48, it hereby ORDERED that their 49 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. All proceedings are stayed through November 5, 2018, at which time the defendants shall file a status report regarding: (a) the IRS's progress in addressing the plaintiff'sconcerns, (b) what issues remain in dispute, and (c) whether scheduling briefing as to a renewed motion for summary judgment by the IRS is needed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/9/18. (ms) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-09-0450AFFIDAVIT re Mailing of Motion for Extension of Time by GEORGE D. HOUSER. (ztl) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1151MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition or Other Response to Defendant's most recent request for 90 day stay by GEORGE D. HOUSER; "Leave to file is granted" signed by Judge Walton (ztd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-11-0552STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-0553MOTION to Stay by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondada, Kavitha) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the plaintiff's 51 motion for an extension of time to respond to the defendants' Third Motion to Stay 48 , which the Court granted by minute order on August 9, 2018, is denied as moot. It is further ordered that the plaintiff's opposition or other response to the defendants' motion to continue the stay 53 is due by December 7, 2018. If the plaintiff does not file his response timely, or if he does not oppose the defendants' motion, the Court will stay these proceedings until February 4, 2019, at which time the defendants shall file an answer and a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/7/18. (ms) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to the defendants' motion to continue the stay due by 12/7/2018 (hs) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-12-1054RESPONSE re 49 Third MOTION to Stay filed by GEORGE D. HOUSER. (ztd) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's November 7, 2018 Minute Order, the plaintiff was to respond to the defendant's motion to continue the stay by December 7, 2018. The plaintiff has not responded, and the Court hereby GRANTS the defendant's motion 53 . These proceedings shall remain STAYED through February 4, 2019, at which time the defendant shall file its Answer to the plaintiff's complaint or a status report regarding the parties' efforts to resolve this matter. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/14/18. (ms) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint/Status Report due by 2/4/2019 (hs) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-3155Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to George D. Houser; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order dated 12/14/2018; Resent without labels (hs) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar