Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01402
Date Filed2016-07-05
Date Closed2016-11-21
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Justice for the Title Page, Table of Contents, and Executive Summary for all non-public OIG reports since 2005. EPIC requested inclusion in the news media fee category as well as a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but did not rule on EPIC's fee status or its fee waiver request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-07-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4592344) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Justice, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-052Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-074NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jay Butler on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Butler, Alan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/8/2016) (jf). (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-075NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/8/2016) (jf). (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/11/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/11/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/11/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/10/2016.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DOJ Delivery Receipt, # 2 Affidavit Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Attorney General Delivery Receipt, # 4 Affidavit US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit US Attorney Delivery Receipt)(Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-08-177NOTICE Regarding Service of Complaint and Motion to Set Due Date For Defendant To Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Truong, John) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-178MOTION for Order Setting Due Date for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of the points raised in 7 defendant's notice regarding service, it is ORDERED that by August 19, 2016, plaintiff shall provide the Court with any reasons why the extension sought by defendant should not be granted. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/18/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-189NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall provide the Court, by 8/19/2016, with any reasons why the extension of time to respond to the complaint sought by defendant raised in 7 defendant's notice regarding service, should not be granted. (jth) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-1810RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Order filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-18MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Order. After consideration of 7 defendant's notice and 10 plaintiff's response, it is ORDERED that 8 defendant's motion is granted. Defendant shall have until September 9, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/18/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer or otherwise Response to the Complaint in this matter is now due by 9/9/2016. (jth) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-09-0811ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Truong, John) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-09MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before October 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/9/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before 10/7/2016. (jth) (Entered: 09/10/2016)
2016-09-3012Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 14, 2016, if the matter has not been dismissed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/30/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-1413Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 status report, the parties shall file a further status report by October 28, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/17/2016.(lcabj3) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-2814Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-31MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a further joint status report by November 21, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/31/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 11/21/2016. (gdf) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-2115STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff