Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKNOWLES v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01450
Date Filed2016-07-14
Date Closed2018-03-29
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffSAMUEL KNOWLES
Case DescriptionSamuel Knowles, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications between the Bahamas and the Drug Enforcement Administration pertaining to Knowles' transport to the U.S. The agency withheld records under Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Knowles filed an appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [25]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-07-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by SAMUEL KNOWLES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-145Summons (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (jf) (dr). (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAMUEL KNOWLES (jf) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-143PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by SAMUEL KNOWLES (jf) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-144ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $16.66 from Prison Account of Samuel Knowles and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 07/12/2016. (jf) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/18/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/18/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/17/2016.) (jf) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/26/2016 (jf) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-168MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Posner, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 08/29/16. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/18/16. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-299ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Posner, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-09-0910RESPONSE re 9 Answer to Complaint filed by SAMUEL KNOWLES. (jf) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-10-2911MINUTE ORDER: Local Civil Rules 16.3(b)(9) and 16.5(c)(1) exempt this FOIA action from the rules governing conferences, schedules, and discovery. In its Answer filed on 08/29/16, Defendant asserts defenses and contends that plaintiff is entitled to no relief. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file either a dispositive motion or a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions on or before 11/21/16. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/29/16. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 10/29/2016)
2016-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive Motion or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/21/2016. (tb) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-0312NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Michael B. Posner (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-1813MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-12-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that defendant shall file a status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before 01/03/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/06/16. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule/Status Report due by 1/3/2017. (tb) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2017-01-0314PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE and Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's dispositive motion shall be filed on or before March 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/06/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion is due by 3/15/2017. (jth) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2615JUDICIAL NOTICE by SAMUEL KNOWLES (jf) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-2116RESPONSE to Respondent's Letter dated 01/31/2017 filed by SAMUEL KNOWLES. (jf) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-0717RESPONSE re 16 Response to Document Opposing Plaintiff's Requested Relief filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-1318MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc, and defendant shall file its dispositive motion on or before 03/31/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/20/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-3119MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of Eric F. Stein and Exhibits, # 5 Declaration of Gail A. Brodfuehrer and Exhibits, # 6 Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick and Exhibit)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-0720Order advising plaintiff to respond by 5/22/2017 or Court may deem matter as conceded re: 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/6/2017. (jth) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-05-2421Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SAMUEL KNOWLES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration and Exhibits)(jf) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-3122REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-08-1423NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2018-01-1724MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by SAMUEL KNOWLES (jf) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-03-2925MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/29/2018. (jth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-2926ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's 24 Motion for the Court to Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 201 is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that judgment is entered for the Defendant on all claims, and this case is closed. This is a final appealable order. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/29/2018. (jth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff