Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF ANIMALS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01475
Date Filed2016-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF ANIMALS
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the primate sanctuary Chimp Haven in Keithsville, LA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-07-191COMPLAINT against USDA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4609695) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defendant USDA, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-202CIVIL COVER SHEET by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS re 1 Complaint, filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS.(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-08-054NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/27/16. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2016. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 7/26/2016 (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-24NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General; emailed to michaelharris@friendsofanimals.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Submit all of the green return receipt cards electronically. File them as a notice. (ztd, ) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-248NOTICE Re Proof of Service Return Receipt by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS re 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, 5 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-269ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-09-3010STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 10/4/16. . . . .MOTION for Summary Judgment by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Harris, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2016 (td). (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0311MOTION to Stay Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-04MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's 11 Motion to Stay is granted in part and denied in part. Although FOIA cases are exempt from Local Rule 16.3, the Court will nevertheless strike 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as premature in light of Defendant's status report on its ongoing production efforts. It is further ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report no later than October 31, 2016 advising the Court whether summary judgment motions will be required and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/4/2015. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2016 (zlsj) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-04MINUTE ORDER striking 10 Motion for Summary Judgment: Although FOIA cases are exempt from Local Rule 16.3, the Court will nevertheless strike 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as premature in light of Defendant's status report on its ongoing production efforts.. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/4/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-3112STATUS REPORT by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-21MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report on Defendant's ongoing production efforts on or before December 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/21/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2016 (zlsj) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-12-2113Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-0414Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-1315STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff