Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAQUALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01504
Date Filed2016-07-22
Date Closed2016-11-22
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffAQUALLIANCE
Case DescriptionAqualliance submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the Giant Garter Snake recovery plan. The agency located 289 pages and withheld them all under Exemption 5 (privileges). Aqualliance filed an administrative appeal, but after the agency failed to respond further, Aqualliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-07-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE AND UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4614006) filed by AQUALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for US Fish and Wildlife Service, # 5 Summons for US Dept of the Interior)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-222Corporate Disclosure Statement by AQUALLIANCE. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-22Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (jd) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-253SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-08-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Return Reciept)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/5/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Return Reciept)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/5/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 8/1/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Return Reciept- U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/5/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/1/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt- U.S. Department of the Interior)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/5/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-178NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-299Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall have up to and including October 3, 2016, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/31/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/3/2016. (tb) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-3010Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting 10 defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall have up to and including November 2, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/11/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/2/2016. (tb) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-11-0111Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-02MINUTE ORDER granting 11 defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall have up to and including November 16, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/2/2016. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/16/2016. (tb) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-1612STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff