Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL FEDERATION OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES, FD-1, IAMAW v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01545
Date Filed2016-07-29
Date Closed2016-11-07
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL FEDERATION OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES, FD-1, IAMAW
Case DescriptionThe National Federation of Federal Employees submitted three FOIA requests to the U.S. Forest Service. One was for travel vouchers, one was for contracts, and the third was for job descriptions. The agency acknowledged receipt of all three, but after the agency failed to respond to any of the requests, the National Federation of Federal Employees filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-07-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4621686) filed by NATIONAL FEDERATION OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES, FD-1, IAMAW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USFS Summons, # 3 Summons Lynch Summons)(Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-012NOTICE of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by NATIONAL FEDERATION OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES, FD-1, IAMAW (Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-01Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (INCORRECT SUMMONS WERE FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. FOIA SUMMONS NEED TO BE FILED IN THIS CASE.) (md) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-013NOTICE by NATIONAL FEDERATION OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES, FD-1, IAMAW (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Returned Certified Mail Card)(Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/08/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Returned Certified Mail Card)(Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE served on 8/8/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Returned Certified Mail Card)(Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-09-068NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-069Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/7/16. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/7/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-10-0610Consent MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's consent motion to stay proceedings for one month. This case is hereby stayed until 11/7/2016. Defendant's Answer is due 11/8/2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/11/2016. (lctsc2) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/8/2016, (zsm) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-11Case Stayed (zsm) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-11-0411NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NATIONAL FEDERATION OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES, FD-1, IAMAW (Sutich, Stefan) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-0712ORDER: In light of the Notice of Dismissal filed by the Plaintiff 11 , this action is hereby DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/7/16. (DJS) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff