Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJackson v. Asst US Attorney's Office N/D IL
DistrictEastern District of Texas
CityBeaumont
Case Number1:2016cv00308
Date Filed2016-07-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marcia A. Crone
PlaintiffJohnny Jackson
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-07-281Motion to Enjoin the Assistant United States Attorney from Improperly Withholding Agency Records, and to Order the Production of the Improperly Withheld Documents filed by Johnny Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope)(mrp, ) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-28ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin pursuant to GO 05-10.(mrp, ) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-262PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER. It is ordered that Pla submit within 20 days either the $400.00 filing fee or an application to proceed IFP w/a printout from BOP showing deposits made to pla's prisoner account during the preceding 6-month period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/26/16. (mrp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-09-063ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Johnny Jackson on 8/31/16 of 2 Order to Submit Printout of Deposits,. (mrp, ) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-214MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-235REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U. S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the 1 Complaint filed by Johnny Jackson should be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/23/16. (mrp, ) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-10-056OBJECTION to 5 Report and Recommendations by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-057MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-118ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Johnny Jackson on 9/30/16 of 5 Report and Recommendations. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-119OBJECTION to 5 Report and Recommendations by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-11-3010INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE ORDER. It is ordered that an Initial Partial Filing Fee of $100.00 shall be paid to the Clerk within 30 days from the date set forth below. Upon receipt of the initial partial filing fee, the Court, as required by PLRA, will order the agency having custody of plaintiff to make monthly withdrawals from his inmate account and forward them to the Court until the balance is paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/30/16. (mrp, ) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-0911ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Johnny Jackson on 12/2/16 of 10 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee,. (mrp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-23INITIAL Partial Filing fee paid per court order: $ 100, receipt number TXE100013464 (aam, ) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2017-01-1912Letter from Johnny Jackson requesting docket sheet. Docket sheet mailed on 1/20/17. (mrp, ) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-04-2013MOTION to clarify claims raised in plaintiff's FOIA suit by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-2214NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnny Jackson to USP; P O Box 2000; Bruceton Mills, WV 26525. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-09-0715Request for status of case by Johnny Jackson. (mailed docket sheet on 9/7/17) (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2018-01-3016ORDER granting 13 Motion for leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/30/2018. (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-3017ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff shall pay $250.00, the balance of the filing fee, in monthly installments. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the court on a regular basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/30/2018. (bjc, ) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-3018ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve process upon the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Illinois at 219 S Dearborn St 5th Floor Chicago IL 60604. The defendant shall have 60 days from the date of service of process to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/30/2018. (bjc) (Main Document 18 replaced on 2/5/2018) (mrp, ). (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-0119SUMMONS Issued as to Asst US Attorney's Office N/D IL and given to USM for service with Order for Service, IFP Order, Summons and USM 285. (mrp, ) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-04-1620MOTION for Entry of Default by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-0221REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 20 MOTION for Entry of Default should be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 5/2/2018. (bjc) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-1022Letter from Johnny Jackson requesting docket sheet. Docket sheet mailed on 5/11/18. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1523OBJECTION to 21 Report and Recommendations by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-07-0924Letter from Johnny Jackson requesting status of case. Docket sheet mailed on 7/10/18. (mrp, ) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-10-3025Summons Returned Unexecuted by Johnny Jackson as to Asst US Attorney's Office N/D IL. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2019-01-1426NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnny Jackson from USP Hazelton to: USP Atwater, P O Box 019001; Atwater, CA 95301. (mrp, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-03-2027MEMORANDUM ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's 20 motion for default judgment is denied. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/20/19. (mrp, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-0828NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 27 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Johnny Jackson. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-16NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Johnny Jackson. USCA Case Number 19-40325. (mrp, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar