Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01581
Date Filed2016-08-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND
Case DescriptionThe Partnership for Civil Justice Fund submitted FOIA requests to the National Park Service and the General Services Administration for records concerning the use of public forum space abutting the Old Post Office Building in Washington, D.C., which is currently being developed as Trump International Hotel. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and told the Partnership that the requests were considered voluminous in scope. The Partnership heard nothing further from the agencies and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantUNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-031COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4627165) filed by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons United States Department of the Interior, # 3 Summons United States General Services Administration, # 4 Summons United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia, # 5 Summons Attorney General of the United States)(Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-03Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-082SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/8/2016. (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2016. (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-316NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-087ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit by September 22, 2016, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/08/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-09Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit by 9/22/2016, a proposed briefing schedule. (ad) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-228NOTICE Joint Report Pursuant to the Courts September 8, 2016, Minute Order by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-23MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 8 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall provide a further joint status report to the Court by December 1, 2016, which may include a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/23/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall provide a further joint status report to the Court by 12/01/2016, which may include a proposed briefing schedule. (ad) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-12-019STATUS REPORT Joint Report Pursuant to the Courts September 23, 2016, Minute Order by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) Modified event title on 12/2/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Notice, the Court ORDERS that they shall provide a further joint status report by January 6, 2017, which may include a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/02/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 1/6/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2017-01-0610Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's December 2, 2016, Minute Order by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND. (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-09MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 10 Notice, the Court ORDERS that they shall provide a further joint status report by February 3, 2017, which may include a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/9/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
2017-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
2017-02-0311Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's January 9, 2017, Minute Order by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE FUND. (Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER: Per 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall provide to the Court, on or before March 17, 2017, a report of the status of Defendants' productions and creation of Vaughn indexes, as well as a proposed briefing schedule or proposed schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/6/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/17/2017 (nbn) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-03-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-20MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 12 Joint Status Report of March 17, 2017, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall provide a report by April 28, 2017, of the status of Defendants' productions and searches, creation of Vaughn indexes, if any, and proposed briefing schedule or proposed schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/20/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/28/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-2813Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's March 20, 2017 Minute Order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 13 Joint Status Report of April 28, 2017, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall provide a further report by June 2, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/28/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/2/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-06-0214Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 14 Joint Status Report of June 2, 2017, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall provide a further report by June 29, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/5/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-2915Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-03MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, (1) Defendant GSA shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before July 24, 2017; (2) Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before August 24, 2017; (3) Defendant GSA shall files its opposition to the cross-motion and reply on or before September 18, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before October 13, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/3/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/24/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/24/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2017. Replies due by 10/13/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-2116Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-24MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before August 1, 2017; and 2) Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 1, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/24/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 8/1/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/1/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-08-0117MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Travis Lewis Declaration, # 2 Travis Lewis Declaration - Ex. A, # 3 Travis Lewis Declaration - Ex. B)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff