Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01592
Date Filed2016-08-05
Date Closed2017-01-17
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning references in the OIG report pertaining to former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton's use of emails relating to her staff's reluctance to communicate as to whether they were printing and filing emails as well as records preservation requirements. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4629386) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Department of State, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U>S. Attorney General)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-05Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-083NOTICE OF COMPLETED INITIAL CIVIL FILING by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 1 Complaint, (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-094SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/15/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/15/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2016.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-09-146NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Leah Kneedler on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-147ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 29, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/15/16. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-16Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by 9/29/2016. (ad) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-298Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-299SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall produce any non-exempt records, or portions of records, by October 28, 2016; and 2) The parties shall file a status report on or before November 12, 2016, updating the Court on the production and any discussions between the parties regarding a potential narrowing of the issues in dispute. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/29/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall produce any non-exempt records, or portions of records, by 10/28/2016; and the parties shall file a status report on or before 11/12/2016, updating the Court on the production and any discussions between the parties regarding a potential narrowing of the issues in dispute. (ad) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-11-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the Joint Status Report filed by the parties on November 10, 2016, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 20, 2016, informing the Court as to whether any further proceedings will be necessary, and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/14/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-14Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 12/20/2016, informing the Court as to whether any further proceedings will be necessary, and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule. (ad) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-12-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file either a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, or a joint status report on or before January 19, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/21/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall file either a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, or a joint status report on or before 1/19/2017 (nbn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-1712STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 12 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/17/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff