Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHALL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01591
Date Filed2016-08-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCALVIN JAMES HALL
Case DescriptionCalvin Hall, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records about himself. After hearing from none of the various DOJ components, Hall filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Criminal Division
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-051COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by CALVIN JAMES HALL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-052MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CALVIN JAMES HALL (jf) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-053PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by CALVIN JAMES HALL (jf) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-054ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $33.00 from Prison Account of Calvin James Hall and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/01/2016. (jf) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-05Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/5/16. (td) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-085SUMMONS (8) Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 8/10/2016; FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 8/10/2016; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/10/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/10/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/9/2016.) (jf) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-117SUMMONS REISSUED as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (md). (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES served on 8/12/2016 (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-169RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/15/2016 (jf) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-1810NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-09-0811MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-09Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $33.00, receipt number: 4616080348. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-12MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to November 8, 2016, to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/12/16.(ah) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-1412NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 10 Notice of Appearance (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-14Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $5.08, receipt number: 4616080486. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-10-14Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $50.36, receipt number: 4616081069. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-11-0813ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-0814MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-0815MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - P. Sprung Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 - S. Boucher Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 - R. Rodgers Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 - K. Myrick Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 - D. Luczynski Declaration, # 7 Statement of Facts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/9/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-09MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that the FBI's Motion for Partial Stay 14 is DENIED because no briefing schedule is in place. As proposed, the FBI shall file a status report and a proposed schedule by January 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/9/16.(ah) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-0916Order advising plaintiff to respond by December 23, 2016, to defendants' dispositive motion or risk summary dismissal of the complaint in part or entry of judgment in favor of the moving defendants on what may be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/9/16.(ah) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-10Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $72.20, receipt number: 4616081544. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-12-13Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $46.64, receipt number: 4616082016. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-2717RESPONSE re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CALVIN JAMES HALL. (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2016-12-2718RESPONSE re 14 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule filed by CALVIN JAMES HALL. (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2016-12-2719RESPONSE re 13 Answer to Complaint filed by CALVIN JAMES HALL. (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-0620REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-0621STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-13Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $76.20, receipt number: 4616082414. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In the absence of a response from Plaintiff, Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's proposed schedule [Dkt. 21] in this FOIA case is hereby approved, as slightly modified. Accordingly, the FBI's motion for summary judgment is due on or before September 28, 2017; Plaintiff's response to the FBI's summary judgment motion is due on or before November 7, 2017; the FBI's reply is due on or before November 30, 2017. In addition, the FBI's periodic status reports on the processing of records are due by April 7, 2017, June 5, 2017, and August 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/1/17. (ah) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/7/2017 Summary Judgment motions due by 9/28/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/7/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2017. (tj) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-14Partial Filing Fee Received from CALVIN JAMES HALL in the amount of $66.52, receipt number: 4616082973. PAID IN FULL(zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-04-0722STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2017) (jf). (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-06-0523STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer despite the apparent logistical challenges. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before July 27, 2017, discussing (1) whether plaintiff is satisfied with the FBI's release of records and agrees to a voluntary dismissal of the complaint against the FBI, and if not (2) whether the issues to be addressed in the FBI's motion for summary judgment, currently due on or before September 28, 2017, can be narrowed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/6/17.(ah) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/27/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-07-2724STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-09-1925MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's Motion to Enlarge the Briefing Schedule 25 is granted. The FBI's motion for summary judgment is due by November 9, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition is due by December 20, 2017; and any reply is due by January 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/19/17.(ah) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1926ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment; directing EOUSA to supplement the record by October 30, 2017, for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/19/17.(ah) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1927MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/19/17.(ah) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff