Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlliance for the Wild Rockies v. United States Bureau of Reclamation et al
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityMissoula
Case Number9:2016cv00101
Date Filed2016-08-08
Date Closed2016-12-12
JudgeJudge Dana L. Christensen
PlaintiffAlliance for the Wild Rockies
Case DescriptionThe Alliance for the Wild Rockies submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Reclamation and the Bonneville Power Administration for records concerning consultations with other agencies pertaining to the operation of certain dams within the bull trout critical habitat. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked the Alliance for clarification. The Alliance provided clarification of its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the Alliance for the Wild Rockies filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Reclamation
DefendantBonneville Power Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-081COMPLAINT filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - BOR Letter, # 3 Exhibit C - BPA Letter, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG, ) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-08Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-1819880. (ASG, ) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-082Summons Issued as to all Defendants. Originals mailed to Counsel Akland. (ASG, ) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-153Order Setting: Vaughn Index due by 10/31/2016. Status Report due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/15/2016. (DLE) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-09-124ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Bonneville Power Administration, United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-10-285MOTION for Extension of Time to File (complete Vaughn Indexes) Mark Steger Smith appearing for Defendants Bonneville Power Administration, United States Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-316Order Setting: Vaughn index due by 1/31/2017. Status Report due by 3/1/2017. Motions terminated: 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (complete Vaughn Indexes) filed by Bonneville Power Administration, United States Bureau of Reclamation. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/31/2016. (DLE) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-12-097STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bonneville Power Administration, United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-128ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/12/2016. (ASG) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-129ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC re 8 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/12/2016. (dle) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff