Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN ANTI-VIVISECTION SOCIETY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2016cv04283
Date Filed2016-08-08
Date Closed2016-08-19
JudgeHONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND
PlaintiffAMERICAN ANTI-VIVISECTION SOCIETY
Case DescriptionThe American Anti-Vivisection Society submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records from the agency's Law Enforcement Management Information System concerning investigations of the import and export of primates. The other request was for import information on dogfish sharks. The agency responded to both requests, but redacted information under Exemption 4 (confidential business information), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The Society filed appeals of both responses, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Society filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 144825.), filed by AMERICAN ANTI-VIVISECTION SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheets)(tj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-08Summons 4 Issued; 3 Mailed to Counsel and 1 Forwarded to the U.S. Attorney's Office 8/8/16 as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (tj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-112Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kp, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-193NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (ADAWI, NADIA) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff