Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01621
Date Filed2016-08-10
Date Closed2017-06-15
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy and Environment Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning email correspondence involving three agency employees in reference to two non-government individuals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told EELI that it had located 9,267 emails that it would process and disclose on a rolling basis. EELI submitted a second FOIA request for emails involving seven agency employees and referring to various keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-101COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4633983) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons To Attorney General, # 3 Summons To Environmental Protection Agency, # 4 Summons To US Attorney)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-102Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) Modified on 8/10/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-10Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons). (sth) Modified on 8/11/2016 (sth). (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-114STANDING ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/11/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/16/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 8/19/2016 (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-146NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-147Joint MOTION to Stay by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is hereby stayed until December 5, 2016. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before December 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/14/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are to file a joint status report on or before 12/5/2016. (kt) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-12-058Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion for Further Stay by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-059Joint MOTION to Stay and Joint Status Report by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report and Motion for Further Stay of Proceedings 9 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. This case remains STAYED until January 19, 2017, and the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before January 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/5/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due on or before 1/19/2017. (kt) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2017-01-1910Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion for Briefing Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-1911Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Joint Status Report by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Briefing Schedule 11 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 27, 2017; Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before April 28, 2017; and Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment on or before May 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Summary Judgment motion by 3/27/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/28/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/12/2017. (dot) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-03-2312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule 12 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before April 10, 2017; Plaintiff shall file its opposition on or before May 12, 2017; and Defendant shall file its reply on or before May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/24/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 4/10/2017; Plaintiff shall file its opposition on or before 5/12/2017; Defendant shall file its reply on or before 5/26/2017. (kt) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-04-1013MOTION for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit (Vaughn Index), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-05-1014Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Summary Jugment Motion by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule 14 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The Court's Minute Order of March 24, 2017, is hereby AMENDED as follows: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before May 19, 2017, and Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/10/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 5/19/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before 6/2/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-1815Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion for Further Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule 15 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The Court's Minute Order of May 10, 2017, is hereby AMENDED as follows: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 2, 2017, and Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/18/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 6/2/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before 6/16/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-06-0216Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion for Further Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule 16 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The Court's Minute Order of May 18, 2017, is hereby AMENDED as follows: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 16, 2017, and Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/2/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 6/16/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before 6/30/2017. (kt) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-1517NOTICE of Settlement by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice 17 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/15/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff